Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Davila et al
Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Jill Davila and Maycelle Davila
Case Number: 1:2010cv01924
Filed: October 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Receipt of Interpleaded Funds and Dismissal of Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/11/12. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER for Distribution of Interpleaded Funds signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/10/2011. (Jessen, A)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/21/2011 granting 35 Stipulation of the Parties. Primerica Life Insurance Company Dismissed with prejudice from action. (Lundstrom, T)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss 24 , Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/16/2011. (Arellano, S.)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER VACATING February 7, 2011 Hearing Date and Taking Matter Under Submission (re 24 Motion to Dismiss), Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/3/2011. (Arellano, S.)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion To Dismiss (Doc. No. 10 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/18/2011. (Fahrney, E)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER vacating hearing date of December 20, 2010 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/14/2010. (Nazaroff, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Davila et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gail E. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Davila
Represented By: Gary Lanson Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maycelle Davila
Represented By: Mark Suren Poochigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?