Montanez v. Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: Paul Montanez
Defendant: F. A. Gonzalez, Clark Kelso, Velasco, Campbell, Ross Marvin, Jae Lee, J. Nickolic, Brian Grimm, Vicki and Bobby
Case Number: 1:2010cv01931
Filed: October 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Action, With Prejudice, for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Obey a Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/26/2014, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due by Within Fourteen-Days. (Marrujo, C)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Sixty-Day Extension of Time; ORDER Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel 98 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/24/14. (Verduzco, M)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ADOPTING 89 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING 78 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/10/2014. (Jessen, A)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DENYING 81 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Without Prejudice and ORDER DENYING 85 Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order Directing Service of Witness Subpoenas Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/18/2013. (Jessen, A)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER DENYING 79 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Supplemental Amended Pleading signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/14/2013. (Jessen, A)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING 68 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend His Complaint; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to File Third Amended Complaint Lodged on July 5, 2013; and ORDER Directing Defendant Grimm to File a Responsive Pleading Within Twenty (20) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/14/2013. (Jessen, A)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER REQUIRING Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/12/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADOPTING 63 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING 61 Plaintiff's Motion for Access to the Law Library signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/26/2013. (Jessen, A)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DENYING 64 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/14/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Access To The Law Library (ECF No. 61 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/22/2013. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 2/25/2013. (Fahrney, E)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/5/2012 adopting 56 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; denying 41 Motion to Dismiss; denying 51 Motion for Sanctions and striking 52 Counter Motion. (Lundstrom, T)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/22/2012 recommending that 41 MOTION to DISMISS and 51 MOTION for Sanctions be denied and that 52 MOTION to Defendants Reply be stricken. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 11/26/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/12/2012. (Jessen, A)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING 44 Plaintiff's Motion for Access to Law Library signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/12/2012. (Jessen, A)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/7/2012 granting in part 32 Motion to Amend the Complaint; denying 31 Motion to alter or amend judgment; denying Motion for appointment of counsel and recalling 23 Order directing USM to serve complaint.(Lundstrom, T)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Access To The Law Library (ECF No. 29 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/20/2012. (Fahrney, E)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/12/2012. (Jessen, A)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants and Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/9/2012. F. A. Gonzalez, Clark Kelso, Jae Lee, Ross Marvin, J. Nickolic, Velasco, Vicki, Bobby and Campbell terminated. (Jessen, A)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 21 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/9/2012. (Fahrney, E)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 9 Motion Injunctive Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 08/15/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel 3 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/20/2010. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montanez v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. A. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jae Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Nickolic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Grimm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?