Irvin v. Yates, et al.
Plaintiff: Kajauna Kenyatta Irvin
Defendant: James A. Yates, P. D. Brazelton, K R Nash, D B Allen, S. Lantz, James - Bennett, W Myers, E. McBride and D - McGee
Case Number: 1:2010cv01940
Filed: October 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted; the Clerk of Court be DIRECTED to enter Judgment In Favor of Defendants re 164 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT and 141 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT ; referred to Judge DROZD, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/15/17. Objections to F&R due by 9/18/2017 (Martin-Gill, S)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 166 Motion to Stay the Proceedings, DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel, and DENYING Request to Further Extend the Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/20/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 134 Motion for Substitution of Shannon Lantz in Place of Deceased Defendant Seth Lantz, re 158 , 159 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/2/17. Shannon Lantz added. (Gonzalez, R)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 156 Motion for Postponement of Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Directing that Opposition, If Any, Be Filed by January 6, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/8/16. (Gonzalez, R)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER DIRECTING Deceased Defendant Seth Lantz's Counsel to Re-Serve the Suggestion of Death, Along With a Copy of Plaintiff's Motion for Substitution on Successor, Shannon Lantz, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/16/2016. (Marrujo, C)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File Further Response to Complaint within Thirty Days from the Date of Service of this order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/11/2016. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER ADOPTING 136 Findings and Recommendation and DENYING 89 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/7/16. (Marrujo, C)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Denying Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS re 89 , 109 , 118 , 120 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/8/16. Rreferred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Denying 130 Plaintiff's Motion for Copy of Legal Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/28/15. (Gonzalez, R)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Granting Defendants' Request To Extend The Dispositive Motion Deadline, Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Modification Of The Discovery Deadline Without Prejudice, And Granting Plaintiff Forty-Five Days To File A Rule 25 Motion (ECF Nos. 121 , 124 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/16/2015. (Fahrney, E)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to File a Response to Defendant Lantz's Motion to Dismiss 70 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/13/2015. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING United States Marshal to Serve Defendant Guthery,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/9/2015. 122 123 (Martin-Gill, S)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant Guthery should not be Dismissed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(M); Show Cause Response Due within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/15/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER ADOPTING 94 Findings and Recommendations, DISMISSING Defendant Lantz re 65 Motion to Dismiss, and GRANTING Plaintiff Ninety Days From the Date of Service of This Order to File a Proper Motion for Substitution, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/24/15. (Marrujo, C)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Extending January 5, 2015 Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendants Farkas, Shimmin, Fisher, Walker, Sobee, Huckabay and Trimble, and Resetting Deadline to File Exhaustion Motion to July 13, 2015, As to These Defendants Only, re 68 , 96 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/13/15. (Gonzalez, R)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant Lantz's 65 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/7/2015, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER EXTENDING Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendant Bennett signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/8/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 74 Request for Non-Transfer to Conduct Conferences or Deposition, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/11/15. (Gonzalez, R)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Finding Service Of Fourth Amended Complaint Appropriate, And Forwarding Plaintiff The Necessary Service Of Process Forms (ECF Nos. 50 , 51 , 54 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/28/2014.(Case Management Deadline: 3/2/2015) (Fahrney, E)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint 50 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/09/14. Referred to Judge Ishii. Thirty-Day Objection Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Re Defendants' Request for Screening of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/3/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING 34 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 8/8/2012. (Marrujo, C)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff, Kajauna Kenyatta Irvin, CDC #J-28785 to CSP-Solano On or Before May 9, 2012, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 3/18/12. Proceedings at CSP-Solano May 9, 2012 at 11:00 A.M. (Gonzalez, R)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER STAYING Case Pending Completion of Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 3/1/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING 21 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/27/2012. (Marrujo, C)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief, filed December 28, 2011, be DENIED; re 12 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Kajauna Kenyatta Irvin ; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 7/30/2011. Objections to F&R due by 9/6/2011 (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irvin v. Yates, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kajauna Kenyatta Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Yates
Represented By: Julie Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. D. Brazelton
Represented By: Julie Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K R Nash
Represented By: Julie Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D B Allen
Represented By: Julie Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lantz
Represented By: Julie Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James - Bennett
Represented By: Julie Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Myers
Represented By: Julie Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. McBride
Represented By: Julie Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D - McGee
Represented By: Julie Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?