Vigil v. Yates, et al.
Plaintiff: Willie Paul Vigil, Jr.
Defendant: James A. Yates, D. Revees, R Valencia, R Diez, S Espino, C. King, H. Howard, V. Obrian, K Solo, R Das and E. Brown
Case Number: 1:2010cv01977
Filed: October 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's 49 Motion to Dismiss, filed on December 2, 2016, should be granted on the grounds of failure to exhaust administrative remedies, and this action be dismissed, without prejudice ; referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/25/2017. Objections to F&R due by 8/28/2017(Martin-Gill, S)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/2/16. ( Settlement Conference set for 11/4/2016 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng at Corcoran State Prison) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 35 ; ORDER that this Action Proceed on the Third Amended Complaint against Defendant Valencia for Excessive Force; ORDER Dismissing Remaining Claims, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/26/16. Defendants Yates, Diez, Espino, King, OBrien, Howard, Solo, Das, and Brown Dismissed. (Verduzco, M)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that this Action Proceed on the 27 Third Amended Complaint as to Plaintiff's Claims of Excessive Force Against Defendant Valencia and that the Remaining Claims and Defendants be Dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/18/16. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying Motions for Screening 30 , 31 , 33 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/11/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 28 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/6/14: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, RECOMMENDING THAT THIS ACTION PROCEED ONLY AGAINST DEFENDANTS VALENCIA AND DIAZ FOR USE OF EXCESSIVE FORCE, AND DEFENDANT VALENCIA FOR RETALIATION, AND THAT ALL OTHER CLAIMS AND DEFENDANTS BE DISMISSED signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/4/2014. Objections due in 20-Days. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.(Lundstrom, T)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Case for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With Court Order 19 , Objections, if any, Due in Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/25/14. (Hellings, J)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 15 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/24/2011. Second Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (# 10 and # 11 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/13/2010. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigil v. Yates, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Paul Vigil, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Revees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Diez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Espino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Obrian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Solo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Das
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?