Atchison v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Deborah Lynn Atchison
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2010cv01987
Filed: October 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER AFFIRMING Agency's Denial of Benefits and ORDERING JUDGMENT for Commissioner signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/1/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER for a First Extension of 30 Days for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Opening Brief: Response by 7/25/2011, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/22/2011. (Herman, H)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/22/2010. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atchison v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lynn Atchison
Represented By: Robert Decker Christenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?