McKenzie v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mary H. McKenzie
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2010cv02036
Filed: November 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Regarding 22 Petition for Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/16/2012. (Figueroa, O)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 1 Plaintiff's Appeal From the Administrative Decision of the Commissioner of Social Security be GRANTED and That the Matter be REVERSED and REMANDED for the Award of Benefits to Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/2/2011. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER for First Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/13/2011. ( Filing Deadline: 11/10/2011) (Figueroa, O)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 12 Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/15/2011. (Plaintiff's Confidential Letter Brief shall be served on Defendant by 7/18/2011) (Figueroa, O)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/1/2010. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenzie v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary H. McKenzie
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?