Duncan v. Comissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Terry Lynn Duncan
Defendant: Comissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2010cv02143
Filed: November 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint; ORDERED to DENY Plaintiff's appeal from the administrative decision of the Commissioner of Social Security, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/21/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time and Modifying Scheduling Order 12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/24/11: Plaintiff's confidential letter brief due July 25, 2011; Defendant's confidential letter brief due September 1, 2011; Any Stipulation to Remand due September 19, 2011; Plaintiff's opening brief due October 4, 2011; Defendant's responsive brief due November 7, 2011; and Plaintiff's reply brief due November 25, 2011. (Hellings, J)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDERED that the clerk issue summons and the United States marshal serve a copy of the complaint, summons and this order upon the defendant(s) as directed by the plaintiff. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/18/2010. (Martin, S)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:10-cv-3008 EFB) to FRESNO (1:10-cv-2143 SKO) signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/17/10. (Williams, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duncan v. Comissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Lynn Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?