Medina-Lara v. Holder
Petitioner: Jose Luis Medina-Lara
Respondent: E Holder
Case Number: 1:2010cv02255
Filed: December 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting Respondent's Renewed 20 Motion to Dismiss Amended Petition; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Enter Judgment and Close the Case; NO CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY IS REQUIRED signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 06/16/2011. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Mootness 16 ; ORDER REQUIRING Respondent to File Response to January 5, 2011 Modified Order to Show Cause Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/6/11: Respondent's Motion is DENIED without prejudice to filing a successive motion to dismiss with additional evidence regarding mootness. (Hellings, J)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Modifying Order To SHOW CAUSE Dated December 15, 2010 (Doc. 4 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/5/2011. (Show Cause Response due by 2/22/2011)(Fahrney, E)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Doc. 2 ),signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/3/2011. (Fahrney, E)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why The Petition Should Not Be Granted; ORDER DIRECTING The Clerk to Serve Documents on Respondent, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/14/10.(Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina-Lara v. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Luis Medina-Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: E Holder
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?