July 17, 2014 |
Filing
62
Stipulation and ORDER re Dismissal with Prejudice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/16/14. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
|
June 2, 2014 |
Filing
60
ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT. On May 29, 2014, the parties filed a joint status report indicating that they had reached a settlement, 59 . The parties shall file the appropriate pleadings to dismiss or conclude this action by no later than 9/12/2014. The Court VACATES all pending matters and dates. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/2/2014. (Timken, A)
|
March 4, 2014 |
Filing
58
STIPULATION and ORDER for Additional Stay to Allow Time for Approval of Settlement Agreement. The stay on discovery and all class certification shall remain in place; and the parties shall submit a new proposed scheduling order regarding class certification and discovery on or before June 30, 2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/4/2014. (Timken, A)
|
January 2, 2014 |
Filing
56
STIPULATION For Additional Stay and ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/2/2014. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The stay on discovery and all class certification shall be extended through February 28, 2014; and 2. The parties shall submit a new proposed scheduling order regarding class certification and discovery on or before February 28, 2014.)(Gaumnitz, R)
|
October 29, 2013 |
Filing
54
STIPULATION and ORDER for Additional Stay. The stay on discovery and all class certification shall be extended through December 30, 2013; and the parties shall submit a new proposed scheduling order regarding class certification and discovery on or before January 2, 2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/29/2013. (Timken, A)
|
June 26, 2013 |
Filing
51
STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings and ORDER THEREON, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/25/2013. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Discovery and all class certification deadlines are hereby STAYED; 2. The 8/21/2013, hearing on Plaintif fs' motion for class certification is VACATED; 3. The parties shall file status reports regarding their settlement discussion progress on 8/30/2013; and 4. The parties shall submit a new proposed scheduling order regarding class certification and discovery on or before 10/29/2013.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
February 11, 2013 |
Filing
43
SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER. After discussion with counsel, this Court SETS the following dates for class certification only: (1) All class discovery, including motions to compel and discovery ordered as a result of a motion to compel, shall be complet ed by May 1, 2013. (2) Plaintiffs shall file and serve moving papers on class certification by May 31, 2013; (3) Defendants shall file and serve opposition papers on class certification by July 5, 2013; (4) Plaintiffs shall file and serve reply pa pers on class certification by July 19, 2013; and (5) A hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for class certification is set for August 23, 2013, at 9:00 AM, in Courtroom 8, before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/8/2013. (Herman, H)
|
September 24, 2012 |
Filing
36
Stipulation and ORDER to Stay Proceedings and Limit Potential Class Claimants, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/21/2012. (Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.) (Marrujo, C)
|
November 14, 2011 |
Filing
34
Preliminary Scheduling ORDER: (1) 10/1/2012 deadline to file and serve moving papers on class certification; (2) 10/26/2012 deadline to file and serve opposition papers on class certification; (3) 11/16/2012 deadline to file and serve reply papers on class certification; and (4) A hearing on December 14, 2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Additionally, a Mandatory Scheduling Conference is set for 1/15/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Parties may appear at this hearing by telephone. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/10/2011. (Herman, H)
|
October 21, 2011 |
Filing
31
ORDER - Requirement for Mandatory Scheduling Conference with Judge McAuliffe - see attached. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/21/2011. (Herman, H)
|
March 15, 2011 |
Filing
15
ORDER ON CITY DEFENDANTS' F.R.Civ.P. 12 MOTION TO DISMISS 12 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 15, 2011. Motion Hearing currently set for 3/21/2011 is VACATED. (Lira, I)
|
January 25, 2011 |
Filing
10
STIPULATION and ORDER re: Filing of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/25/2011. (Herman, H)
|