Alonso-Prieto v. Pierce, et al.
Plaintiff: Raul Ernest Alonso-Prieto
Defendant: B Pierce, John Doe, Jane Doe and County of Kern
Case Number: 1:2011cv00024
Filed: January 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Denying as Moot 90 Motion to Continue in Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/6/15. (Verduzco, M)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Regarding 82 Response to Order to Show Cause, Pretrial Statement, and Notice of Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/15/14. (Gonzalez, R)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DISMISSING Action with Prejudice for Failure to Obey Court Orders and Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/9/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 75 Motion for Clarification signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/9/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER To SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed With Prejudice For Failure To Comply With Court Order (ECF No. 60 ), Fourteen (14) Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/17/2014. Show Cause Response due by 12/3/2014.(Fahrney, E)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions to Compel, for Reconsideration, Recusal and Transfer of Venue re 69 , 70 ; ORDER Taking Under Submission Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Action and Directing Defendant to Respond within Fourteen Days re 69 , 70 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/30/14. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ASSIGNING CASE re: Presiding Judge, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/23/2014. The New Case Number is 1:11-cv-00024-MJS (PC). (Marrujo, C)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Reconsideration (ECF No. 59 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/30/2014. (Fahrney, E)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Denying 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/9/14. (Verduzco, M)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ADOPTING 53 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, IN FULL; ORDER DENYING 32 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 02/21/2014. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Discovery Motion (ECF No. 54 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/30/2014. (Fahrney, E)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/22/2014 recommending that 32 MOTION to DISMISS be DENIED. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 2/10/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order 51 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/10/14: Discovery Cut-Off Date - 03/10/2014; Dispositive Motion Deadline - 05/19/2014. (Hellings, J)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying Miscellaneous Motions (ECF Nos. 18 , 19 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/27/2012. (Fahrney, E)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Miscellaneous Motions 12 , 13 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/5/12. (Hellings, J)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 6 Motion to Amend the Complaint, Amended Complaint due by 4/30/2011, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/07/2011. (Flores, E)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/10/2011. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application) (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alonso-Prieto v. Pierce, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Ernest Alonso-Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?