City of Lindsay v. Sociedad Quimica Y Minera De Chile S.A. et al
Plaintiff: City of Lindsay
Defendant: Sociedad Quimica Y Minera De Chile S.A. and SQM North America Corporation
Case Number: 1:2011cv00046
Filed: January 10, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER on Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice 139 signed by District Judge Lee H Rosenthal on 9/18/2024. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
August 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER re Settlement signed by District Judge Lee H Rosenthal on 8/27/2024. Notice of Dismissal or Status Report due by 10/28/2024. (Lawrence, A)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE OF RESET signed by District Judge Lee H Rosenthal on 2/28/2024. Status Conference RESET to 3/7/2024 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Lee H Rosenthal via ZOOM. (Marrujo, C)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of RESET: Status Conference (Zoom) set for 3/4/2024 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Sant Agata, S)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting stipulation for lifting of stay of discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/7/2018. (Rooney, M)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Extending Stay of Proceedings Pending Issuance of an Opinion in City of Pomona v. SQM North American Corp., No. 15-56062 (9th Cir.), signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/3/2016. (1. The proceedings in this case, including discove ry, shall remain STAYED, pending the issuance of an opinion in City of Pomona v. SQM N. Am. Corp., No. 15-56062 (9th Cir.), or the conclusion of the proceedings in that action; 2. On June 1, 2016, and every ninety (90) days thereafter, the parties s hall file a joint status report advising the court of the status of the pending appeal; and 3. Upon the issuance of an opinion by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeal in City of Pomona or the conclusion of proceedings in that action, the parties shall notify the court in writing within ten (10) days thereafter.)(Gaumnitz, R)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request to extend the stay pending further proceedings in related appeal and VACATING the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 7/9/2014. The parties will request that the Initial Scheduling Conference be re-scheduled after the stay is lifted. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/2/2014. (Rooney, M)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/12/2014. (Rooney, M)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order extending stay of proceedings pending issuance of an opinion in City of Pomona v. Sociedad Quimica Y Minera De Chile S.A. (9th Cir.) (No. 12-55147), signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/21/2013. (Status report regarding the pending appeal Deadline: 11/1/2013) (Figueroa, O)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER extending stay of proceedings pending issuance of an opinion in the City of Pomona v. Sociedad Quimica Y Minera De Chile S.A (9th Cir.)(No. 12-55147). The Court ORDERS the case stayed through 4/30/2013 with a status report to be filed on or be fore 5/1/2013 re the status the case; case management deadline set for receipt of same. If the Ninth Circuit issues an opinion prior to 4/30/2013, the parties shall notify the Court within ten days of said opinion; order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/21/2012. (Rooney, M)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER On Reconsideration Of Stay (Doc. 65 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/9/2012. This Court DENIES SQMNA's motion for reconsideration. (Fahrney, E)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER RE: Request for Clarification of Scope of Stay Order 64 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/22/12: Neither party may proceed with any discovery or litigation proceedings related to discovery until such time as the Court lifts the stay. (Hellings, J)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER STAYING Proceedings Pending Issuance of an Opinion in City of Pomona v. Sociedad Quimica Y Minera De Chile S.A. (9th Cir.) (No. 12-55147) 35 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/6/12: Case STAYED through October 31, 2012; Defendant's Motion 11 is VACATED. Defendant may re-notice its motion after the Stay has been lifted. (Hellings, J)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Water Supply/Quality Documents From CDPH 61 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/6/12. (Hellings, J)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's 17 Motion to Strike Pursuant to Rule 12(f) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/20/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/26/2011. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Lindsay v. Sociedad Quimica Y Minera De Chile S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Lindsay
Represented By: Todd E. Robins
Represented By: Victor Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sociedad Quimica Y Minera De Chile S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQM North America Corporation
Represented By: Robert Gaylord Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?