Taylor v. Central Mortgage Company
Plaintiff: Phillis A. Taylor
Defendant: Central Mortgage Company
Case Number: 1:2011cv00199
Filed: February 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 12:1461
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Complaint 2 be DISMISSED pursuant to Local Rule 110, for Plaintiff's failure to obey the Court's order of February 11, 2011. Objections to these findings and recommendations are due within twenty (20) days of service of this recommendation. Matter referred to Judge O'Neill; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/4/2011. (Timken, A)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's complaint with leave to amend. Plaintiff SHALL file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of service of this order. If Plaintiff fails to cure the deficiencies noted above or fails to amend the complaint within 30 days, the Court will recommend that the entire action be dismissed with prejudice. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/10/2011. (Timken, A)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/7/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Central Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillis A. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?