Owens v. Chasko
Plaintiff: Michael Owens
Defendant: Stephen B. Chasko
Case Number: 1:2011cv00335
Filed: February 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/13/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Defendant's 16 Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/25/2011. ( Amended Complaint due by 8/26/2011) (Figueroa, O)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER vacating hearing date of 5/31/2011 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/27/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the 16 MOTION to DISMISS Hearing currently set for 5/23/2011 to 5/31/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/2/2011. (Kusamura, W)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION to CONTINUE Mandatory Scheduling Conference and ORDER Thereon signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/19/2011. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 6/27/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Bradley, A)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/6/2011 denying 5 Motion to Dismiss as moot and vacating 4/11/2011 hearing. (Lundstrom, T)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Address Court's Relationship with Defense Counsel, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/7/11. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Chasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen B. Chasko
Represented By: James David Burnside, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Owens
Represented By: Nick A. Pritchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?