Serrano v. Rawers et al
Plaintiff: Jessie L. Serrano
Defendant: Scott Rawers, Edward S. Alameida, Jr., E. Roe, K. Mendoza-Powers, J. Korstjens, A. Godfrey, D.O. Sedley, M. Collie, M. Torres and L. Rutledge
Case Number: 1:2011cv00399
Filed: March 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 JUDGMENT dated 3/11/2016 in favor of defendant, Jeffery L. Lucas, and against plaintiff, Jessie L. Serrano, ENTERED pursuant to the verdict rendered on 3/9/2016. (Rooney, M)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE and ORDER That Inmate Witness is No Longer Needed as Witness in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged 95 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/9/16. (Hellings, J)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Re Admissibility of Plaintiff's Rules Violation Reports at Trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/7/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER for Defendant to File Further Briefing on Admissibility of Evidence by March 4, 2016 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 02/26/2016. (Flores, E)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Addressing Plaintiff's 97 Request for a Long-Sleeved Shirt to Wear at Trial signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 02/24/2016. (Flores, E)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motions (Docs. 93 & 99 ) for Court Appointed Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/24/16. (Marrujo, C)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Jessie L. Serrano, CDC# P-02563, Plaintiff, and His Legal Property on March 8, 2016 at 8:30a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/11/16. (Gonzalez, R)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Telephonic Status Conference Before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/13/2016. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/25/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Sant Agata, S)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Regarding Heck Defense as to 75 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/23/2015. (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER SETTING Briefing Schedule on Heck Defense; Fourteen (14) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/16/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time re 67 and Striking the Pretrial Conference Date re 48 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/2/15. Pretrial Conference date of September 17, 2015, is Stricken. (Gonzalez, R)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER discharging 64 Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/24/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Case Should Not Be Dismissed with Prejudice for Failure to Comply with Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/14/15. Show Cause Response Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING Defendant's 52 Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/15/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER SETTING Depositions Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/4/2015. (Marrujo, C)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING Defendant's 34 Motion for Summary Judgment ; ORDER GRANTING 42 Reply Motion ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 44 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing and for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/30/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING 40 Request to Withdraw Consent; ORDER ASSIGNING Case and Presiding Judge signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/24/2015. The New Case Number is 1:11-cv-00399-MJS(PC). (Sant Agata, S)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 43 Motion Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order ; ORDERED that the deadline to taking depositions are VACATED, and will be reset, if necessary, following a ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/13/15. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File an Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/24/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER (1) Denying 21 Unenumerated Rule 12(b) Motion Without Prejudice, (2) Denying Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time as Moot, and (3) Requiring Defendant to File Responsive Pleading or Motion Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/12/14. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File an Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendant's 21 MOTION to DISMISS Within Twenty-One Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/4/14. (Gonzalez, R)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying Motion To Remove Filing Fee From Plaintiff's Prisoner Trust Fund Account (ECF Nos. 10 & 16 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/22/2013. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serrano v. Rawers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie L. Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Rawers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward S. Alameida, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Mendoza-Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Korstjens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.O. Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Collie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?