Bryant v. Gallagher et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Darnell Bryant
Defendant: Gallagher, Romero, Kelly Harrington and Matthew Cate
Case Number: 1:2011cv00446
Filed: March 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER of Dismissal; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/27/2017. (Flores, E)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER Granting 381 Joint Motion to Vacate Jury Verdict in Accordance with Settlement; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 377 Motion for Attorney Fees as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/15/2017. (Flores, E)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER Granting Parties' Request to File Dispositional Documents within Sixty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/19/2017. (Flores, E)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Supplement Bill of Costs signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/21/2017. (Flores, E)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation Extending Time to File Notice of Appeal 373 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/16/17: Notice of Appeal deadline EXTENDED to July 18, 2017. (Hellings, J)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 367 JUDGMENT dated *5/19/17* pursuant to order (Gonzalez, R)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 368 NOTICE and ORDER that Plaintiff Kevin Darnell Bryant, CDCR #D-56620, Is No Longer Needed as a Witness in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/18/17. (Gonzalez, R)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER Requiring Production of Plaintiff Kevin Darnell Bryant, CDCR #D-56620 for Trial on May 16, 2017 at 8:00a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/15/17. (Gonzalez, R)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 350 STIPULATION re: Trial Testimony of Young N. Paik, M.D.; ORDER. The court Grants the request, in principle, with the following exceptions. The court does not have the technological ability to accommodate last minute requests for video testimony. Tim ing, compatibility, court proceedings, staff unavailability, inability to test, and other issues may determine that video conferencing is not viable. As far as the witness' inability to drive himself, the court notes other options for transporta tion, including his counsel's cooperation, are available. Further, the court has not been informed of, nor has made arrangements for, where, when and how the video is to be accomplished. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/12/2017. (Herman, H)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Modify Second Amended and Supplemental Pretrial Order to Submit Joint Trial Exhibits signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/5/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER GRANTING 326 Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/27/2017. (Jessen, A)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER DENYING 320 Plaintiff's Request Regarding Issuance of Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/18/2017. (Jessen, A)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER in Response to 318 Plaintiff's Request for Clarification Regarding Witnesses signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/17/2017. (Jessen, A)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER Denying Inmate Contreras 306 Motion to be Excluded as Plaintiff's Witness; ORDER Granting Appearance by Video Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/27/2017. (Flores, E)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 310 SECOND AMENDED and SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/02/2016. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/27/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Motion in Limine Hearing set for 5/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Jury Trial set for 5/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.(Flores, E)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER DIRECTING Parties to Respond to 306 Motion to be Excluded as Plaintiff's Witness, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/29/2016. (Case Management Deadline: 12/19/2016) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER to Clerk of Court Directing Return of Witness Fees to Plaintiff's Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/20/2016. (Flores, E)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 304 AMENDED and SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/18/2016. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/17/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe; Jury Trial set for 12/13/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.(Flores, E)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER to Clerk of Court DIRECTING RETURN of Witness Fee for B. Viega to Plaintiff's Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/13/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER Recalling Service of Subpoena on B. DaVeiga by the United States Marshal signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/05/2016. (Flores, E)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Witness Edward A. Vargas, CDCR# J-63103 for Trial on October 17, 2016 at 8:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/27/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER Directing Service of Subpoenas on Witnesses by the United States Marshal without Prepayment of Costs signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/21/2016. (Flores, E)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER DENYING 264 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants to Provide Him a Copy of the Deposition Transcript of Christine Blantz Taken July 29, 2016 Without Cost as Part of Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/16/2016. (Jessen, A)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Notice of Names and Locations of Each Unincarcerated Witness who Refuses to Testify at Trial Voluntarily signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/15/2016. (Flores, E)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 258 PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/4/16. Motions in Limine Filing Deadline: September 2, 2016; Opposition to Motions in Limine Filing Deadline: September 19, 2016; Motion in Limine Hearing: October 4, 2016 at 10:00 am. in Courtroom 8 (BAM); Jury Trial: October 17, 2016, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 8 (BAM). (Marrujo, C)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 247 Motion to Strike Defendants' Expert Disclosures signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/29/2016. (Flores, E)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Subpoena Forms 245 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/15/16. (Hellings, J)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 240 First Motion for Modification of the Court's Second Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/06/2016. (Flores, E)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER re 237 Notice of Unavailability of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/23/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER REGARDING Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Send Consent Form to Defendants; Ten (10) Day Deadline signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/21/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 198 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/25/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 226 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 176 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/18/16. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty Days. (Marrujo, C)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Firest Request for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's 8/10/2015 Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/31/2015. (14-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/7/2015 requiring that Defendants file a response to Plaintiff's 199 Motion for an Order to Show Cause. (Filing Deadline: 8/31/2015). (Lundstrom, T)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER ADOPTING 189 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 188 Motion for Court Order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/15/2015. (Flores, E)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 188 Motion for Extension of Time; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 188 Motion for Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/20/2015, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Ex Parte 186 Motion for Order Granting Plaintiff Telephone Calls, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/3/2015. (Marrujo, C)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/12/2015. Confidential Settlement Conference Statement due: 5/18/2015; Settlement Conference set for 6/2/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Flores, E)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Granting Joint 180 Request for Referral to the Court's Prisoner Settlement Program signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/10/2015. (Flores, E)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Certification Of Interlocutory Appeal (ECF No. 173 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/2/2015. (Fahrney, E)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER Setting Dispositive Motion Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/10/2014. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/10/2015. (Jessen, A)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Writ of Mandate 147 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/10/14. (Verduzco, M)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Second 153 Motion for Order to Compel Production of the Oringal Color Photos signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/07/2014. (Flores, E)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 156 Motion for this Court to Amend it's 9/13/2014 Order Pursuant to Appellate Rule 5(a)(3) to Include the Permission to Appeal signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/06/2014. (Flores, E)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 127 Motion to Compel Production of the Medical Records Subpoenaed From Mercy Hospital Bakersfield; ORDER VACATING 139 Order Providing Mercy Hospital With the Opportunity to Show Cause Regarding Compliance With Subpoena Duces Tecum; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 141 Motion to Issue Contempt Charges on Mercy Hospital, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/24/2014. (Marrujo, C)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 143 Motion for Injunctive Relief, Reconsideration and Recusal of Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/13/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Directing Defendants to File Response to Plaintiff's (1) Motion to Compel Production of Medical Records; (2) Motion to Preserve all Records; and (3) Motion for Court to Issue Contempt Charges signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/26/2014. (Flores, E)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Providing Mercy Hospital With The Opportunity To Show Cause Regarding Compliance With Subpoena Duces Tecum, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/23/2014. Show Cause Response due by 6/26/2014. (Fahrney, E)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 135 Third Motion for Extension of Time to File His Reply; ORDER VACATING April 28, 2014 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Order Reopening Discovery (Doc. 134 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/29/2014. Deadline: May 16, 2014. (Marrujo, C)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 113 Motion for Order Reopening Discovery; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 120 Motion Requesting the Court File and Respond/Rule on Attached Motion as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/28/2014. (Marrujo, C)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 118 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/27/14. (Gonzalez, R)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File Response to Plaintiff's 113 Motion for an Order to Reopen Discovery; Twenty-One Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/27/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 105 Motion to Appoint Counsel; ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 108 Motion for a Docket Sheet and Directing Clerk's Office to Provide Plaintiff with Copy of Docket signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/17/2013. (Flores, E)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 77 Motion to Compel Plantiff's Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories, Set One, and Requests for Production of Documents, Set One, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/5/2013. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Provide Date of Birth for Records Request signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 01/14/2013. (Flores, E)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/2012 granting 92 Motion to modify the Scheduling Order to vacate the deadline for filing Dispositive Motions. (Lundstrom, T)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' 77 Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/5/2012. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 AMENDED ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to Serve Written Interrogatories (Docs. 73 , 75 , 82 & 86 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/21/2012. (Marrujo, C)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER ADOPTING 81 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for a Court Order and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of the Discovery as a Sanction signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/20/2012. (Flores, E)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denying Plaintiff's 80 Motion for Court Order and Denying Plaintiff's 79 Motion for an Extension of the Discovery Deadline as a Sanction; Objections Due within Fifteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/30/2012. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 11/19/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Amend The Scheduling Order And Extend The Discovery Deadline (ECF No. 74 ), Thirty-Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/17/2012. (Discovery due by 11/19/2012)(Fahrney, E)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting Defendants' Request To Depose Plaintiff By Videoconference (ECF No. 69 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/14/2012. (Fahrney, E)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Denying 66 Motion to Serve Discovery on the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/23/2012. (Flores, E)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ADOPTING Findings and Recommendations and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for a Court Order 58 , 62 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/7/12. (Hellings, J)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denying Plaintiff's 58 Motion for a Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/13/2012. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 5/21/2012. (Flores, E)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 58 Motion for an Extension of Time ; ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 59 Motion for a Pitchess Motion Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/13/2012. (Marrujo, C)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 55 Motion for Blank Subpoena Duces Tecum signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/14/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 51 Motion for Subpoenas signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/29/2012. (Flores, E)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Denying Defendants' 39 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status and Dismiss Action signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/02/2012. (Flores, E)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/25/2011. (Flores, E)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Immediate and Emergency Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 08/31/2011. (Flores, E)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims and DENYING Plaintiff's 19 Motion For a Preliminary Injunction, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/15/2011. (Marrujo, C)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk's Office to Serve Courtesy Copies of this Order and the 16 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motions for a Preliminary Injunction on Warden Harrington at Kern Valley State Prison signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/21/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Gallagher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Darnell Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?