Espritt v. Saesee et al
Plaintiff: Brian Espritt
Defendant: A. Saesee, S. Hill, S. Torres, J. Davis, M. Lopez, A. Ballesteros, Y. Magallon, Velazquez, Furlong, Black, Sumpter and Goss
Case Number: 1:2011cv00519
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS re 72 Defendants' Motion for Summary JUDGMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/3/15. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER STRIKING SURREPLY 81 ; PERMITTING PLAINTIFF OPPORTUNITY TO WITHDRAW OPPOSITION AND FILE AMENDED OPPOSITION signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/20/2015. (Filing Deadline: 6/22/2015). (Lundstrom, T)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Adopting 67 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION; ORDER DENYINGDefendants' 56 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER for Defendants to File Motion or Answer within Thirty Days signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/15/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Remedies, Filed on May 7, 2014, be DENIED; Defendants be Required to either file a Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to Albino v. Baca or File an Answer to the Second Amended Complaint re 17 and 56 ; referred to Judge Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 09/13/14. Objections to F&R due by 10/20/2014 (Martin-Gill, S)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Denying Unenumerated Rule 12(b) Motion, Without Prejudice, On Procedural Grounds And Requiring Defendants To File Responsive Pleading Or Motion Within Thirty Days (Doc. 37 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/11/2014. (Fahrney, E)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING 50 Motion to Amend the Complaint and STRIKING the Proposed Third Amended Complaint Lodged on March 24, 2014; ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, to the Extent it acts as an Impermissible Surreply, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/28/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING 38 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/3/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 30 ), ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Doc. 21 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/19/2013. (Fahrney, E)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That This Action Proceed Only Against Defendants Saesee, Hill, Torres, Davis, Lopez, Ballesteros, and Magallon on Plaintiff's Claims for Excessive Force, and That All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed From This Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/29/13. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections, If Any, Due in Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 23 ; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief 21 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/26/13. (Verduzco, M)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief be Denied; Objections, if any, Due in 30 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/7/2013. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 4/9/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/14/11. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espritt v. Saesee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Espritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Saesee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Ballesteros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y. Magallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumpter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?