Solis v. National Emergency Medical Services Association

Plaintiff: Hilda L. Solis
Defendant: National Emergency Medical Services Association
Case Number: 1:2011cv00529
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Reporting & Disclosure Act
Cause of Action: 29:0401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT re 85 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/2/13. (Gonzalez, R)
April 29, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/26/13. (Gonzalez, R)
March 25, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING plaintiff, Department of Labor's, motion for summary judgment, document 24 . As this matter has settled, the motion is formally DENIED without prejudice. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/22/2013. (Rooney, M)
March 1, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court Plaintiff's status report; ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/1/2013. (Status Report or Certification of the Election Deadline: 4/26/2013) (Figueroa, O)
November 9, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/9/12. (Case Management Deadline: 1/31/2013 and Filing Deadline: 2/28/2013.) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 1, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/31/12. The trial set for October 23, 2012, and the Pre-trial Conference set for September 6, 2012, are VACATED. (Verduzco, M)
May 24, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Non-Expert Discovery Deadline and Non-Dispositive Motion Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/23/2012. (Non-Expert Discovery deadline extended to 6/19/2012, Non-Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/20/2012. All other orders contained in this Courts scheduling order 61 issued on 9/9/2011 remain in full force and effect.) (Gaumnitz, R)
May 9, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice and ORDER for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant, National Emergency Medical Services Association, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/8/12. Former Attorney: Gary G. Goyette; New Attorney: Geoffrey O. Evers. (Verduzco, M)
March 22, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Non-Expert Discovery Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/21/2012. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the non-expert discovery deadline be moved from April 2, 2012, to May 23, 2012. All other dates and deadlines set forth in the Court's Scheduling Order remain in effect.(Bradley, A)
March 19, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: 56 Motion to Vacate Order for Mootness signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/16/2012. (Figueroa, O)
October 14, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing date of October 17, 2011 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/14/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
August 15, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Motion To Dismiss (Docs. 38 and 49 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/12/2011. (Fahrney, E)
July 13, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing date of 7/18/2011 and taking matter under submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/12/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
June 9, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying request for Preliminary Injunction. Hearing date of 6/13/2011 is vacated. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/9/2011. (Nazaroff, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solis v. National Emergency Medical Services Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda L. Solis
Represented By: Glen Frederick Dorgan, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Emergency Medical Services Association
Represented By: Gary Guy Goyette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?