Dupree, Jr. v. Scott, et al
Plaintiff: Richard Jose Dupree, Jr.
Defendant: Jim Scott
Case Number: 1:2011cv00565
Filed: February 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION for Failure to State a Claim without Leave to Amend signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 07/08/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED Without Prejudice re 1 Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/11/2011. Referred to Judge Wanger. Objections to F&R due within thirty days. (Jessen, A)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/8/2011 directing Clerk of Court to redesignate action as a regular civil case. (Lundstrom, T)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:11-cv-0532 CMK PC) to Fresno (1:11-cv-0565 DLB PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/5/2011; this court has not ruled on pltf's request to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dupree, Jr. v. Scott, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Jose Dupree, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?