Walker v. Uribe
Petitioner: Michael E. Walker, II
Respondent: Domingo Uribe, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00585
Filed: April 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Directing The Clerk To Substitute Warden P.D. Brazelton As Respondent (Doc. 28 ), FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS To Grant Respondent's Motion To Dismiss The Petition (Doc. 28 ), FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS To Dismiss The Petition As Untimely, Decline To Issue A Certificate Of Appealability, And Direct The Clerk To Close The Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/4/2013. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 2/11/2013. (Fahrney, E)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Permitting Respondent to File a Reply to 33 Petitioner's Amended Opposition no Later than Twenty Days after Service of this Order; ORDER Permitting Petitioner to File a Sur-Reply no Later than Twenty Days After Service of a Reply signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/03/2012. Reply due by 10/29/2012.(Flores, E)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING 15 Findings and Recommendations to Dismiss the Initial Petition; ORDER DENYING Petitioner's Renewed 17 Motion for a Rhines Stay of the First Amended Petition; ORDER GRANTING Petitioner Thirty (30) Days from the Date of Service of this Order to Withdraw the Unexhausted Claims in the 16 First Amended Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/21/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Discharging Order To Show Cause (Doc. 7 ), ORDER Denying Petitioner's Motion For Stay And Abeyance Of The Petition (Doc. 13 ), FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATION To Dismiss The Petition Without Prejudice For Failure To Exhaust State Court Remed ies (Doc. 1 ), Decline To Issue A Certificate Of Appealability, And Direct The Clerk To Close The Action, Objections Deadline: Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/12/2011. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Objections to F&R due by 1/17/2012) (Fahrney, E)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Petitioner to SHOW CAUSE in Thirty (30) Days Why The Petition Should Not Be Dismissed for Petitioner's Failure to Exhaust State Remedies, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/3/11: Show Cause Response due by 6/6/2011.. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Uribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael E. Walker, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Domingo Uribe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?