Guy v. Mims et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Edward Guy
Defendant: Michelle Lefors, Kurtze, Margret Mims, Terry Ashmore, Ebguziem and J. Ruiz
Case Number: 1:2011cv00721
Filed: May 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/22/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER directing Defendants to respond within 10-days to request for withdrawal of action re 26 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/14/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING 16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/3/2013. Margret Mims (Sheriff) terminated. (Jessen, A)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Certain Defendants; Thirty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/17/2013. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 11/21/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND ;ORDERED to file a First Amended Complaint within (30) Days from the date of service of this order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 10/06/2011.First Amended Complaint (30) Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 6/16/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guy v. Mims et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Lefors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurtze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margret Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebguziem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Edward Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?