Clayton v. Knight Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Don Clayton
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00735
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement And Partially Granting Motion For Attorney Fees And Costs (ECF Nos. 75 - 78 , 80 - 82 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/21/2014. (Fahrney, E)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER requiring counsel to comply with Local Rule 133(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/4/2014. (Hernandez, M)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER on motion seeking preliminary approval of class action settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2013. (Hernandez, M)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER on joint stipulation to extend date to file motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement and set preliminary approval hearing date. The parties deadline to file the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is extended to 9/27/2013; The Motion for Preliminary Approval hearing is set for 10/30/2013 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/30/2013. (Hernandez, M)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Regarding Notice of Settlement and Joint Stipulation to Vacate the Trial Date and All Related Dates on Calendar Pending Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Doc. 66 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/20/2013. (Arellano, S.)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting Approval of Class Notice; of Settlement Administrator; and Authorizing Distribution of Class Notice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/25/2013. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING, as moot, defendant's request to appear telephonically at the 10/23/2012, scheduling conference, document 46 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/17/2012. (Rooney, M)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Adopting 41 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/20/12. Motion to Certify Class 17 Granted. (Gonzalez, R)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/15/2012. Motion referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 8/20/2012. (Figueroa, O)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's request to appear telephonically at the 6/15/2012 hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/12/2012. (Kusamura, W)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING 30 Request to Strike, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/8/2012. (Figueroa, O)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Protective ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/6/2012. (Figueroa, O)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines to Complete Pre-certification Discovery and Motion for Class Certification,signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/30/2012. (Pre-Certification Discovery due by 3/7/2012; Motion for Class Certification filed by 4/20/2012; Motion for Class Certification Heard by: 6/5/2012) (Figueroa, O)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION - Discovery Deadlines - Initial Disclosure 8/1/2011; Non Expert 2/15/2012; Expert 1/5/2012; Class Certification Motion Deadline to file 3/30/2012; Hearing 5/15/2012; Scheduling Conference set for 6/19/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/14/2011. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayton v. Knight Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald J. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Clayton
Represented By: Craig Justin Ackermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?