United States of America v. 2007 Ford F-150 Pickup Truck, License Number 8X28407, VIN: 1FTPW12V67KA73125
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 2007 Ford F-150 Pickup Truck, License Number 8X28407, VIN: 1FTPW12V67KA73125
Case Number: 1:2011cv00783
Filed: May 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Final Judgement of Forfeiture signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/8/2012. (Jessen, A)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 recommending that the District Court grant Plaintiff United States of America default judgment against the interests of Roy Strickland, Robin Strickland, and Adan Montalvo; and the District Court direct the Clerk of the Court to enter a final judgment of forfeiture vesting in Plaintiff United States of America all right, title, and interest in the defendant vehicle. Matter referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due within thrity (30) days; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/5/2011. (Timken, A)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/26/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for publication signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/23/2011. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 2007 Ford F-150 Pickup Truck, License Number 8X28407, VIN: 1FTPW12V67KA73125
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David Taylor Shelledy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2007 Ford F-150 Pickup Truck, License Number 8X28407, VIN: 1FTPW12V67KA73125
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?