Omara v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Michael A. Omara
Defendant: Steven Smith, Jack St. Clair, Matthew Cate and J. Clark Kelso
Case Number: 1:2011cv00812
Filed: May 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/24/2012 adopting 30 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and REMANDING CASE to Tuolumne County Superior Court. A Certified Copy of remand order sent to Tuolumne County Superior Court. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 15 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Be Granted In Part and Denied In Part re 1 Notice of Removal, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/20/2011. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of the Court to DISMISS: DEFENDANTS Matthew Cate and J. Clark Kelso pursuant to Plaintiff's NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/03/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING First 21 Motion to Extend Time to File a Response to Defendants' Motion and DENYNING 21 Motion for Copy of Defendants' Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/26/2011. (Filing Deadline: 8/29/2011.) (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omara v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Omara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Smith
Represented By: Mitchell Aaron Wrosch
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack St. Clair
Represented By: Mitchell Aaron Wrosch
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Represented By: Mitchell Aaron Wrosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Clark Kelso
Represented By: Martin H. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?