Stanley v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Solomon T. Stanley
Defendant: State of California and California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 1:2011cv00981
Filed: June 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION for an Extension of Time to File the Request for Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/21/2014. (Hall, S)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT re 51 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/17/2014. (Hall, S)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 49 Stipulation to Continue the Pretrial Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/3/2014. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 5/15/2014 at 09:15 AM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street (JLT), Bakersfield, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DISCHARGING 42 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/6/2014. (Hall, S)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER to Counsel to SHOW CAUSE Why Trial in this Matter Should Not Be Advanced to June 9, 2014, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/24/2014. (Hall, S)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER To SHOW CAUSE Why Plaintiff Should Not Be Sanctioned (Doc. 34 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/11/2014. Show Cause Response due by 2/19/2014. (Fahrney, E)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO RESET TRIAL signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 24, 2013. Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2014 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial currently set for 12/3/2013 has been CONTINUED to 8/12/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Munoz, I)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference Procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/28/2013. (Martinez, A)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/5/13: Pretrial Conference RESET for 10/24/2013 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Jury Trial RESET for 12/3/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Consent/Decline due no later than 3/5/2013. (Hellings, J)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 16 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 17, 2012. Motion Hearing currently set for 12/20/2012 is VACATED. (Munoz, I)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER to Modify the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/6/2012. (Kusamura, W)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Shanna Michelle Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Shanna Michelle Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon T. Stanley
Represented By: Larry Herb Shapazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?