D.C. et al v. Oakdale Joint Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: D. C. and T. C.
Defendant: Shauna Rico, Cinnamon Simpson, Oakdale Joint Unified School District, Katie Craig, Stephanie Hicks, Kathleen Jenkins, Larry Mendonca, Rhonda Duarte and Julie Minabe
Case Number: 1:2011cv01112
Filed: July 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER on Stipulation and Request for Dismissal of Entire Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 2/12/13. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING 61 Petition for Approval of Minor's Compromise. The previously scheduled hearing date of 1/25/2013 is VACATED and the parties shall not appear. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 1/23/2013. (Hernandez, M)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Directing Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Request or to Withdraw Prior Opposition, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 1/8/2013. (It is HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs Supplemental Request or file a notice of intent to withdraw their Opposition; and 2. Defendants shall file their response or notice of intent to withdraw by 1/18/2013.)(Gaumnitz, R)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER CONTINUING FILING and HEARING Dates on Phase I Motions for Summary Judgment (Doc. 55 ), Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/27/2012. The Phase I briefing schedule is hereby modified as follows: (1) Motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before December 3, 2012; (2) Oppositions shall be filed on or before January 9, 2013; and (3) Replies shall be filed on or before January 31, 2013. (Arellano, S.)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER for Referral to Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/12/2012. (Jessen, A)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER regarding 38 Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/25/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER VACATING Hearing Date of January 30, 2012 and Taking Matter Under Submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/23/2012. (Figueroa, O)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING 32 Request for Continuance of Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/28/2011. ( Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck) (Figueroa, O)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 11 Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/17/2011. (Amended Complaint Due Within Twenty-One Days.) (Marrujo, C)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER vacating hearing date of October 31, 2011 and order for further briefing. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/26/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER MOVING Hearing, re 11 Motion to Dismiss, to October 31, 2011 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2, Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/13/2011. (Arellano, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.C. et al v. Oakdale Joint Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shauna Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cinnamon Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakdale Joint Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mendonca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Minabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. C.
Represented By: Tamara Lynn Loughrey
Represented By: Evan Barnett Goldsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. C.
Represented By: Evan Barnett Goldsen
Represented By: Tamara Lynn Loughrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?