Masterson v. Killen et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Masterson
Defendant: Susanne Killen, Velva Rowell, Brad Hall and Patricia Medved
Case Number: 1:2011cv01179
Filed: July 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 211 Motion for Aid of Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 69 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/02/2019. (Flores, E)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to CLOSE CASE Pursuant to Parties' Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/2/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER that Inmate Daniel Masterson is no longer needed as a Witness in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/23/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Motion in Limine 203 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/22/2018. (Hellings, J)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER VACATING March 2, 2018 Telephonic Hearing and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 179 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/1/2018. (Hellings, J)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Daniel Masterson, CDCR# H-22514 for Settlement Conference on March 23, 2018 at 9:00 a.m., at Corcoran State Prison signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/22/2018. (Flores, E)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/21/2018. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Jury Trial set for 5/1/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Flores, E)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Requiring Status Report and Hearing on Plaintiff's 179 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte 184 Motion for Extension of Time to Meet Trial Scheduling Order Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/16/2018. Telephonic Hearing set for 3/2/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Flores, E)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference on March 23, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/12/2018: Settlement Conference set for 3/23/2018 at California State Prison, Corcoran, before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Hellings, J)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's 180 Motion for Attendance of Unincarcerated Witnesses Pursuant to the Court's Trial Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/5/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER ADOPTING 173 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Dismissing Certain Defendants signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/08/2018. New Case Number 1:11-cv-1179 SAB.(Flores, E)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiffs equal protection claims, due process claims, failure to protect claims, and claims for denial of access to the courts be dismissed from this action for the failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; defendants Johanna Cordova and M. Gomez be Dismissed from this action for the failure to state any cognizable claims for relief against them re 28 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Daniel Masterson ; referred to Judge Drozd; new case number is 1:11-cv-1179 DAD-SAB (PC),signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/5/17. Objections to F&R due by 12/26/2017 (Martin-Gill, S)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER RESETTING Telephonic Trial Scheduling Hearing to October 13, 2017 at 9:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/29/17. (Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Setting Telephonic Trial Scheduling Hearing on 10/14/17, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/28/17. Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Gonzalez, R)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 90 Motion for Summary Judgment ; ORDER DENYING 118 Motion ; ORDER DENYING 120 Motion to Stay; ORDER DENYING 122 Motion ; ORDER DENYING 123 Motion for Sanctions; ORDER ADOPTING 141 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER ADOPTING 142 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING 155 Motion for Extension, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/16/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for a Copy of Transcript of Evidentiary Hearing 154 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/18/17. (Hellings, J)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Regarding 152 Plaintiff's Request That Court Clerk Verify Objections to Findings and Recommendations Were Filed With the Court signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/9/2017. (Jessen, A)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Cross-Motions for Sanctions re 118 , 120 , 122 , 123 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/6/17. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER THAT INMATE DANIEL MASTERSON, CDCR H-22514, IS NO LONGER NEEDED AS A WITNESS IN THESE PROCEEDINGS, AND THE WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM IS DISCHARGED, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/15/17. (Hellings, J)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 134 Motion for Issuance of an Order and Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum for an Inmate Witness and a Subpoena for an Officer Witness, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/13/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT INMATE DANIEL MASTERSON, CDCR # H-22514 on 2/15/17 at 10:00 AM, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/26/17. (Hellings, J)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Adopting 113 Findings and Receommendations and Denying 85 Motion for Injunctive Relief, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/6/17. (Gonzalez, R)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's 85 MOTION for Injunctive Relief be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/19/16. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 87 Motion to extend time to file Dispositive Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/29/2016. (Dispositive Motion Deadline: 6/10/2016).(Lundstrom, T)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting 82 Defendants' Request to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/16/16. Dispositive Motions Deadline: 4/29/2016. (Gonzalez, R)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 69 Motion to Compel and for In Camera Review 69 ; ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 72 Motion to Compel further Discovery Responses and to Extend the Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/11/2015. Dispositive Motion Deadline is: March 16, 2016 (Martin-Gill, S)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Sealing Exhibit [72-3], signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/3/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting Defendants' Request to Extend Time to File a Motion to Compel re 70 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/19/15. (Gonzalez, R)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Hampson's Request for Production of Documents, Set One and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline 65 , 66 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/13/15: 10-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING 61 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/16/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER STRIKING 54 Discovery Document Filed With the Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/19/2015. (Marrujo, C)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING Parties' 51 53 Requests to Modify Scheduling Order; ORDER EXTENDING Deadlines for All Parties to this Action signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/15/2015. New Discovery Deadline: 10/15/2015; New Dispositive Motions Deadline 12/15/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 45 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/25/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re Plaintiff's 43 Motion to Defense Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/24/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement the Complaint 21 (Also Resolves Doc. 20 ); ORDER Directing Clerk to File Second Amended/Supplemental Complaint Lodged on March 1, 2013 22 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/7/13. (Gonzalez, R)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, 7 , 9 , 13 ; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion Re Posting Security as Moot 12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/6/12. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masterson v. Killen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susanne Killen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velva Rowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Medved
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?