Mitchell v. Pena, et al.
Plaintiff: John Edward Mitchell
Defendant: R. Indemill, Pena, H.A. Sumaya, T. Cano, B. Albitre and Marlene Smith
Case Number: 1:2011cv01205
Filed: July 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER to Defendants to file a Status Report regarding Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/11/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Dismissing Action with Prejudice per Stipulation, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/24/14. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 66 67 Motions for SATF Warden to Produce his Personal and Legal Property as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 06/11/2014. (Flores, E)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 61 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/30/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum for Plaintiff John Edward Mitchell (CDCR# H-38255), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/28/2014. (Marrujo, C)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request to Correct the Spelling of Defendant "Pena" to "Pina" 56 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/13/14. (Hellings, J)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 40 Motion to Serve Additional Interrogatories on Defendant Sumaya signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/26/2013. (Flores, E)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's Notice/Letter From the Docket in This Case 34 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/14/13. (Hellings, J)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Provide Additional Information to Effecuate Service of Process to R. Indermill (aka R. Indemill), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/20/13. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 27 Second Motion for an Order Directing Service as MOOT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/19/2013. (Marrujo, C)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING In Full the 23 Findings and Recommendations DENYING Defendant Sumaya's 20 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER for Defendant Sumaya to Answer OR Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Within 21 Days, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/5/2013. (Marrujo, C)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 24 Motion for an Order Directing Service as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/30/2013. (Flores, E)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Assign this Matter to the Appropriate District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Denying Defendant Sumaya's 20 Motion to Dismis signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/12/2013. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 8/1/2013. (Flores, E)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Mediation signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/30/2012. (Flores, E)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 10 Motion to File First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/2/2011. (Marrujo, C)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Discharging Order To Show Cause (Doc. 6 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/26/2011. (Fahrney, E)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why this Action Should not be Dismissed signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 09/11/2011. Show Cause Response due by 9/29/2011. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Pena, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Indemill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.A. Sumaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Albitre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Edward Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?