Viola Coppola, et al v. Gregory Smith, et al
Plaintiff: Viola Coppola, Gary Coppola and The Trust of Anthony M. Coppola
Defendant: Gregory Smith, Richard Laster and Jane Nash
Cross_claimant: Richard Laster, Gregory Smith and The Jane Higgins Nash Trust
Cross_defendant: Viola Coppola, Gary Coppola, The Trust of Anthony M. Coppola, Jane Higgins Nash, The Trust in the Estate of Mabel Elaine Higgins, deceased, Gregory Smith and Richard Laster
Case Number: 1:2011cv01257
Filed: July 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 546 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/13/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER VACATING NOVEMBER 13, 2018, STATUS CONFERENCE, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/8/2018. (Timken, A)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 525 Order setting mandatory scheduling conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/19/2018. (Settlement Conference set for 5/22/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean) (Rosales, O)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 522 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/13/2018. (Kusamura, W)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER on Plaintiffs' 509 Motion Enforce Settlement, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/2/2018. (Kusamura, W)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER GRANTING Stipulated Request for DISMISSAL by Richard Laster, Paragon Cleaners, Inc., The Coppola Parties, and the Nash Parties, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/18/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER VACATING NOVEMBER 13, 2017 HEARING DATE AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT RICHARD LASTER'S MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/13/2017. (Kusamura, W) (Main Document 506 replaced on 10/13/2017) (Kusamura, W). (Main Document 506 replaced on 10/13/2017) (Kusamura, W).
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO RESPOND TO MOTIONS FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/4/2017. (Kusamura, W)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER Regarding SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (set before Judge McAuliffe on September 13, 2017 at 9:30a.m.), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/29/2017. (Herman, H)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 481 STIPULATION and ORDER Setting a Settlement Conference set for 9/13/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/28/2017. (The Parties shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement to Magistrate Judge McAuliffe on or before September 6, 2017.)(Kusamura, W)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER VACATING MAY 15, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE AND RESETTING MATTER for 6/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/8/2017. (Kusamura, W)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER VACATING 4/24/2017 STATUS CONFERENCE AND RESETTING MATTER to 5/15/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/17/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 468 STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Further Mediation and Status Conference Deadlines and ORDER Resetting Status Conference to April 24, 2017 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/14/2017: It is hereby ordered that the Parties shall mediate wit h neutral, Timothy Gallagher, on April 13, 2017 commencing at 9 a.m. at Mr. Gallaghers office. Counsel and the Parties' insurers with settlement authority are required to attend the settlement/mediation session in person. The April 10, 2017 dead line to file a joint status conference statement is continued. No later than April 17, 2017, the Parties shall submit a joint status report that outlines the status of the case, discusses any new development that would weigh on the trial, and include s agreeable new trial dates. The Status Conference scheduled for 4/17/2017, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom No. 2 is RESET to 4/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Valdez, E) Modified on 3/14/2017 (Valdez, E).
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER on STIPULATION for a Stay and Vacating February 28, 2017 Trial date; Status Conference set for 4/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/24/2017. (Kusamura, W)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/18/2017. (Kusamura, W)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 453 STIPULATION and ORDER SETTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH NEUTRAL TIMOTHY GALLAGHER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/13/2017. (Kusamura, W)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 447 STIPULATION and ORDER Substituting Parties and Directing Clerk to Amend Caption, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/9/16. Estate of Decatur Higgins, Deceased and Estate of Mabel Higgins, Deceased added as Defendants and Cross-Defendants. Jane Nash as Executor of the Estate of Decatur Higgins A/K/A the Estate of Mabel Elaine Higgins terminated. (Verduzco, M)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 445 STIPULATION and ORDER ON UNDISPUTED MATTERS IN LIEU OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/14/2016. (Kusamura, W)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 437 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Close of Expert Discovery Deadline: The Parties hereby stipulate to extend the expert discovery cut-off date, currently scheduled for September 23, 2016, to October 5, 2016. All other deadlines shall remain the same. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/9/2016. (Herman, H)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 432 STIPULATED Request for Dismissal Regarding Visalia Unified School District, ONLY and ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/8/16. Visalia Unified School District terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 430 STIPULATED REQUEST for DISMISSAL Regarding Martin and Martin Properties, LLC, Only; ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/6/16. Martin and Martin Properties, LLC terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER Granting Dismissal of Defendant Cal Water Service Company signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 07/05/2016. (Flores, E)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER VACATING JULY 11, 2016 HEARING DATE AND ORDER ON VISALIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/1/2016. (Kusamura, W)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER on CAL WATER'S Motion to Approve Settlement, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/20/2016. (Kusamura, W)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 401 Order GRANTING Plaintiff's 379 Motion to File an Eighth Amended Complaint and VACATE hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/4/2016. The Motion to Amend Hearing currently set for 5/6/2016 at 9 am before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe is VACATED. (Rosales, O)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 398 STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Extending Deadlines Set Forth in the Court's Scheduling Order. (1) Coppolas fact discovery cut-off against the City, only, currently scheduled for June 1, 2016, shall be moved to June 22, 2016. (2) Initial Exper t Witness Disclosures, currently scheduled for June 24, 2016, shall be moved to July 13, 2016. (3) Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosures, currently scheduled for July 22, 2016, shall be moved to August 18, 2016. (4) The close of expert discovery, currently scheduled to close on September 16, 2016, shall be extended to September 23, 2016. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/26/2016. (Herman, H)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 388 STIPULATION and ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CONTINUING PRIVATE NUISANCE AND NUISANCE PER SE CLAIMS, AGAINST VISALIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ONLY signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/18/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER SHORTENING Time for Hearing Regarding the Motion to Compel the City's Deposition (Doc 384). (1) The motion to compel the City of Visalias Rule 30(b)(6) deposition filed on April 15, 2016 shall be set for hearing on April 27, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. (2) The noticed hearing date of May 6, 2016 is vacated. (3) The Parties Coppola, Laster, Mission Linen and the City of Visalia shall file a joint discovery dispute statement no later than April 20, 2016. MOTION to COMPEL the City of Visa lia's Deposition: Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. NOTE: this hearing is also set in 1:15-cv-0062-AWI-EPG Mission Linen v. City of Visalia. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/18/2016. (Herman, H)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 374 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Expert Witness Scheduling Deadlines: (1) Expert Disclosures: June 24, 2016 ; (2) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: July 22, 2016. All other deadlines remain unchanged, including the close of expert discovery which is set for September 16, 2016. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/3/2016. (Herman, H)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Document Production (Doc. 362). (1) Plaintiffs motion to compel further document production from Defendant the City of Visalia is GRANTED (Doc. 361); (2) On or before March 25, 2016 , Defendant SHALL complete the additional search for responsive documents and produce responsive document as discussed on the record and certify that it has produced, pursuant to a reasonable and diligent search, all responsive documents with in its possession, custody or control; (3) On or before March 21, 2016, Defendant SHALL file a sworn affidavit with the Court explaining its search in detail, including, but not limited to, identifying the custodians contacted and the methodology used; (4) The Court SETS a Status Conference for February 25, 2016, to discuss the deposition date for Defendants 30(b)(6) deponent and whether Defendant has withheld documents under a privilege objection. If the parti es file a status report prior to the Status Conference indicating that the parties have identified a date in mid-April for the Citys deposition and met and conferred about whether the production of a privilege log is necessary, the Court will vacate the status conference; (5) The Court CONTINUES the Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff between Plaintiffs and Defendant the City of Visalia, only, to June 1, 2016 for the purpose of completing the discovery at issue in this order. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/23/2016. (Herman, H)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER DISMISSING Defendants Harley Miller and Cheryl Miller in Light of Unopposed Request to Dismiss 356 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/25/16. (Hellings, J)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER Granting RATIFICATION by the Real Party in Interest Pursuant to Rule 17. (Doc. 357) ORDER VACATING Motion Hearing - scheduled for January 29, 2016, is HEREBY VACATED. Having considered the moving papers, the lack of opposition, all other evi dence in the record, and for good cause shown, Plaintiffs application is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following real parties in interest for purposes of the entire above actionin the capacity of plaintiffs and counter/cross-defendantsare a s follows: Gary Coppola, as an individual; Gary Coppola, as successor trustee of the Viola M. Coppola Irrevocable Trust (in conformity with this Courts prior Order of April 18, 2014 (Doc. 213) and to correct the current Seventh Amended Complaint, and all counterclaims.); Gary Coppola, as trustee of the Anthony M. Coppola Trust. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/21/2016. (Herman, H)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO FILE A SEVENTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND VACATING HEARING, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/27/2015. (Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2015 @3:00 before Judge McAuliffe is VACATED)(Kusamura, W)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 STIPULATION and ORDER Substituting Parties, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/1/15. (Hellings, J)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Stipulation and ORDER Substituting Parties and Directing Clerk to Amend Caption, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/27/15. (Verduzco, M)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Amended Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Confidential Information. The Court has reviewed the stipulation outlined above (Doc. 317) and adopts the stipulation except that the terms related to judicial intervention on a shortened timeline outline d in paragraph 8 will not be automatic, rather, the Court will determine on a case-by-case basis whether judicial intervention is warranted and whether the Court is able to accommodate shortened or expedited hearings. Relatedly, the parties are strongly encouraged to resolve any disputes arising from this agreement independently and without court involvement. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/7/2015. (Herman, H)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER on Plaintiffs' 281 Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant Cal Water's Answer, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/5/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 315 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Joint Scheduling Conference: Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 5/7/2015 to May 12, 2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/27/2015. (Herman, H)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER on the Parties' Cross Motions to Compel (Doc. 256). Based on the foregoing, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: (1). Plaintiffs motion to compel production of documents regarding wells within the City of Visalia (Set One, No. 59, 60, 69, 79, 83-8 5, 89-107, 109-111, 113-128, 131-136, 138-142) is DENIED; (2) Plaintiffs motion to compel production of documents regarding Cal Waters Property at Issue (Set One, No. 28-30, 61, 64-66, 71) is GRANTED; (3) Plaintiffs motion to compel Cal Waters p revious PCE litigation (Set Two, No.143-146), is DENIED; (4) Cal Waters motion to compel further interrogatory responses (Interrogatories Nos. 3-8) is DENIED; (5) Cal Waters motion to compel (RFAs Nos. 6, 7 and 9) is DENIED; (6) Cal Water SHALL produce documents responsive to Plaintiffs propounded discovery as delineated above within 30 days of the service of this order. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/4/2015. (Herman, H)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/9/2015. (Herman, H)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER CLARIFYING the Pleadings and DIRECTING the Clerk to Update the Docket to List "Martin and Martin Properties, LLC" as the Properly Named Defendant, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/4/15. (Marrujo, C)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File a Sixth Amended Complaint In Part (Doc. 249). 1) Plaintiffs Motion to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs are permitted to amend the operative pleading naming V.U.S.D. as a Defend ant; 2) Plaintiff shall file the Sixth Amended Complaint within five days of this order and serve the V.U.S.D no later than February 20, 2015; 3) Once the Sixth Amended Complaint is filed, the Clerk of the Court is directed to add the new pa rties named in the amended pleading to the docket; 4) Defendants Answers are due 21 days after the filing of the Sixth Amended Complaint; or the parties may file stipulations that their answers to the Fifth Amended Complaint are applicable to the Si xth Amended Complaint; and 5) The Court will hold a status conference in this case on Wednesday, April 29, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. At that conference, the parties should be prepared to discuss whether the case should be set for Scheduling Conference. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/11/2015. (Herman, H)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 AMENDED Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Confidential Information (Local Rule 141), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/26/2015. (Herman, H)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER on Defendant's 200 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/15/2015. (Kusamura, W)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Revised STIPULATION (Doc. 241) for Amendment to (1) Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint; (2) Previously Filed Answers, Counter-Claims and Cross-Claims of Gregory Smith; and, (3) Previously Filed Answers, Counter-Claims and Cross-Claims of " The Jane Nash Trust"; ORDER Thereon. Based on the above Stipulation, IT IS SO ORDERED. This Order does not amend any other portion of the reference pleadings. This order does not alter or change the pleadings for purposes of the pending motion for summary judgment. (Doc. 200.) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/26/2014. (Herman, H)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER vacating hearing date of July 28, 2014 and taking matter under submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/24/14. (Nazaroff, H)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Stiuplation to Dismiss, without Prejudice, California Water Service Company's Counter Claim Relating to Punitive Damages Only; ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/3/14. (Verduzco, M)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 STIPULATION and ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference pursuant to Dkt. 214: (1) the Court will hold a SCHEDULING CONFERENCE on July 1, 2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (2) The parties are direc ted to file a Joint Scheduling Conference Statement by June 24, 2014. (3) The parties are further directed to set up a conference call and dial into the Judge's chambers by dialing (559) 499-5789 at the time of the conference. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/27/2014. (Herman, H)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER on Defendant Cal Walter's 174 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/13/2014. (Flores, E)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER Granting Substitution of Plaintiff Viola Coppola, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/16/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Amendment to STIPULATION and ORDER to Add Does 1 through 3 to Plaintiffs' Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/23/2014. (Herman, H)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER VACATING January 27, 2014 Hearing and Taking Motion Under Submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 01/23/2014. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATION and ORDER following the modified scheduling conference of December 23, 2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/3/2014. (Rooney, M)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Send the Parties the Court's Standard Form to Consent or Decline to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction; ORDER REQUIRING the Parties to Return the Forms Within Ten Days, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/3/13. (Hellings, J)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER on Defendant's 123 Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's 129 Motion to Strike signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/8/13. (21-Day Deadline and (28-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER VACATING July 8, 2013 Hearing and Taking 129 MOTION to STRIKE & 123 MOTION to DISMISS Under Submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/2/2013. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the previously set hearing date of July 8, 2013, is VACATED, and the parties shall not appear at that time. As of July 8, 2013, the Court will take the matters under submission and thereafter issue its decision.)(Gaumnitz, R)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STIPULATION for Filing of Defendant Gregory Smith's Amended (1) Answer to Fourth Amended Complaint; (2) CounterClaims Against Plaintiff's; (3) Cross-Claims Against Other Defendants; and (4) Demand for Jury Trial, to Correct Typographical Errors; and ORDER thereon, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/27/2013. (Herman, H)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATION and ORDER for Filing of Defendant Richard Laster's Amended (1) Answer to Fourth Amended Complaint; (2) Counterclaims Against Plaintiff's; (3) Cross-Claims Against Other Defendants; and (4) Demand for Jury Trial, to Correct Typographical Errors; and Other Thereon, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/20/2013. (Herman, H)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Stipulation and ORDER Regarding Extending Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendant Cal Water Service Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint and to Extend Hearing Date, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/15/13. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Verduzco, M)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER on Defendants' 53 54 71 78 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Join Necessary Part, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/26/2013. ( Amended Complaint due by 4/29/2013) (Figueroa, O)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL of Benart Main Street Properties ONLY Without Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/28/12: Parties shall bear their own fees and costs. (Hellings, J)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Benart Main Street Properties to Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint: Response by 11/27/2012. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/8/2012. (Herman, H)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER VACATING 11/5/2012 Hearing and Taking Matters Under Submission, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/31/2012. (Kusamura, W)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Benart Main Street Properties to Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint: Response by 11/9/2012. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/26/2012. (Herman, H)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Benart Main Street Properties to Respond to Plaintiff's 3rd Amended Complaint: by 10/26/2012. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/26/2012. (Herman, H)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Defendant City of Visalia to Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Based on the above stipulation, and for good cause shown, the Court orders as follows: (1) Should the Court grant the City� 39;s motion to dismiss, Plaintiff's shall file an amended complaint and the time to respond shall be determined by ordinary rules of civil procedure in this Court; (2) Should the Court deny the City's motions to dismiss or grant the motions without leave to amend, City shall file an answer within 7 calendar days after the Court enters an order denying the motions. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/18/2012. (Herman, H)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Extending Time for Defendants Gregory Smith, Richard Laster and Benart Main Street Properties to Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (re Stipulations of the parties Docs. 74, 75, 76): (1) Defendant Bernart Main Street Properties answer by 9/26/2012; (2) Defendant Richard Laster answer by 9/19/2012; (3) Defendant Gregory Smith answer by 9/19/2012. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/13/2012. (Herman, H)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER continuing hearing on Martin and Martin Properties, LLC's 71 Motion to Dismiss to November 5, 2012, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/13/2012. (Plaintiff's Opposition Deadline: 10/15/2012; Replies due by 10/22/2012; Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 11/5/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii) (Figueroa, O)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Filing of Third Amended Complaint: Plaintiffs' shall file 3rd Amended Complaint by 8/22/2012. Defendants shall respond to 3rd Amended Complaint by 9/12/2012. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/16/2012. (Herman, H)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Extending Time for Martin and Martin Properties, LLC to Respond to Second Amended Complaint (re 45 Stipulation): by 8/24/2012. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/23/2012. (Herman, H)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and ORDER Granting Extension of Time for California Water Service Company to Respond to Second Amended Complaint: by 8/27/2012. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/19/2012. (Herman, H)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER to Add New Parties and File Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/29/2012. (It is Hereby ORDERED: 1) The Second Amended Complaint is deemed filed as of the date of this order; 2) The Clerk of the Court shall file the Second Amended Complaint, attached as Exhibit A, as a separate entry in the docket for purposes of clarifying the record (Doc. 39-1); and 3) Defendants Answers are due 21 days after the date of this order.)(Gaumnitz, R)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting Leave to File Amended Answer (Gregory Smith), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/16/2012. (Herman, H)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Approving Substitution of Attorney as to Gregory Smith, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/22/11. (Hellings, J)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Requirement for Mandatory Scheduling Conference with Judge McAuliffe - see attached. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/8/2011. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viola Coppola, et al v. Gregory Smith, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Smith
Represented By: Lori J Gualco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Laster
Represented By: Lori J Gualco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Richard Laster
Represented By: Lori J Gualco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Gregory Smith
Represented By: Lori J Gualco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: The Jane Higgins Nash Trust
Represented By: Steven Ray Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viola Coppola
Represented By: Jeff Coyner
Represented By: Danielle Lauren De Smeth
Represented By: Jan A. Greben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Coppola
Represented By: Jeff Coyner
Represented By: Danielle Lauren De Smeth
Represented By: Jan A. Greben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Trust of Anthony M. Coppola
Represented By: Jeff Coyner
Represented By: Danielle Lauren De Smeth
Represented By: Jan A. Greben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Viola Coppola
Represented By: Jeff Coyner
Represented By: Danielle Lauren De Smeth
Represented By: Jan A. Greben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Gary Coppola
Represented By: Jeff Coyner
Represented By: Danielle Lauren De Smeth
Represented By: Jan A. Greben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Trust of Anthony M. Coppola
Represented By: Jeff Coyner
Represented By: Danielle Lauren De Smeth
Represented By: Jan A. Greben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Jane Higgins Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Trust in the Estate of Mabel Elaine Higgins, deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Gregory Smith
Represented By: Lori J Gualco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Richard Laster
Represented By: Lori J Gualco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?