Hill v. Clovis Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Preston Hill
Defendant: Office of the District Attorney Fresno County, Clovis Police Department, Mark Bradford, Elizabeth Egan and Elana Aron Smith
Case Number: 1:2011cv01391
Filed: August 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER CLOSING CASE pursuant to Stipulated Dismissal signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/25/2012. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING 41 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/17/2012. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint consistent with this order within ten (10) days. If no amended complaint is filed, defendants shall file an answer to the complaint within seventeen (17) days. (Jessen, A)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Taking Matters Under Submission, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/16/2012. (Hearing on 41 Motion for Reconsideration set 4/23/2012 is VACATED. As of 4/23/2012, the Court will take Defendants motions for reconsideration under submission and will thereafter issue its decision.)(Gaumnitz, R)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 32 and 34 Motion to Dismiss; ORDERED that Clovis Police Department is again DISMISSED from this case, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/08/2012. (Plaintiff Hill has 21 Day Deadline and Defendants has 28 Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER vacating hearing date of January 23, 2012 and taking matters under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/18/12. (Nazaroff, H)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER VACATING December 19, 2011 Hearing, and ORDER on County Defendants' 12 Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/8/2011. (Figueroa, O)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER on Defendants' 8 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/18/2011. The Clovis Police Department is DISMISSED, but Plaintiff may add the City of Clovis in its stead; All claims against Mark Bradford are DISMISSED without prejudice to amendment; and Plaintiff may file an amended Complaint that is consistent with this order within twenty (20) days of service of this order. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Clovis Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the District Attorney Fresno County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clovis Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elana Aron Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston Hill
Represented By: Lawrence H. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?