Bauer, et al. vs. Harris, et al.
Plaintiff: Barry Bauer, Stephen Warkentin, Nicole Ferry, Leland Adley, Jeffrey Hacker, National Rifle Association of America, Inc., California Rifle & Pistol Association Foundation and Herb Bauer Sporting Goods, Inc.
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris, Stephen Lindley and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2011cv01440
Filed: August 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Re Cross Motions for Summary Judgment re 51 , 52 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/02/15. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING JOINT AMENDED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS (Docs. 48 & 49) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 15, 2014. (Munoz, I)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. The Motion Hearing set for July 26, 2013 is VACATED. Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint within ten (10) days of the service of this order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/22/2013. (Yu, L)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Stipulation to Vacate Rule 16 Scheduling Order and Order Thereon. A Scheduling Conference is now set for August 8, 2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/28/2013. (Yu, L)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/23/2013. (Yu, L)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO STAY HEARING DATE AND EXTEND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES and ORDER THEREON. Motion Hearing is continued to 6/22/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 04/20/2012. (Yu, L)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO STAY HEARING. Motion Hearing is continued to 5/25/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 04/03/2012. (Yu, L)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLEADING DEADLINES AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/11/2012. (Yu, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauer, et al. vs. Harris, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Bauer
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Warkentin
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Ferry
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leland Adley
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Hacker
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Rifle Association of America, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Rifle & Pistol Association Foundation
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herb Bauer Sporting Goods, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Lindley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?