J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Bath et al
Plaintiff: |
J & J Sports Productions, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Tahir Jameel Bath and Umaran Faisal Bath |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv01564 |
Filed: |
September 15, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Fresno Office |
County: |
Merced |
Presiding Judge: |
Dennis L. Beck |
Presiding Judge: |
Anthony W. Ishii |
Nature of Suit: |
Cable/Satellite TV |
Cause of Action: |
47 U.S.C. § 553 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 20, 2014 |
Filing
54
STIPULATION Of Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint Against Defendants Tahir Jameel Bath and Umaran Faisal Bath, ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/19/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
|
May 9, 2014 |
Filing
52
Order requiring parties to file dispositional documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/08/2014. Dispositional Documents Deadline: 6/23/2014. All pending dates, including the Bench Trial currently set for 06/03/2014 are VACATED. (Figueroa, O)
|
February 20, 2014 |
Filing
46
ORDER approving stipulation to continue dates - Pretrial Conference is continued from 2/21/2014 to 4/25/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Motion in Limine hearing is continued from 3/19/2014 to 5/19/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Bench Trial is continued from 4/1/2014 to 6/3/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/20/2014. (Hernandez, M)
|
January 15, 2014 |
Filing
44
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - Pretrial Conference is set for 2/21/2014 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Motion in Limine hearing is set for 3/19/2014 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Bench Trial is set for 4/1/2014 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/14/2014. (Hernandez, M)
|
January 10, 2014 |
Filing
42
ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause, document 33 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/10/2014. (Rooney, M)
|
January 9, 2014 |
Filing
40
ORDER To Assign Action To U.S. Magistrate Judge For All Purposes (Docs. 38 , 39 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/9/2014. New Case Number: 1:11-cv-1564-SAB.(Fahrney, E)
|
November 7, 2013 |
Filing
33
SUMMARY JUDGMENT DECISION (Doc. 27 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/7/2013. This Court: DENIES J&J summary judgment; ORDERS J&J's counsel, no later than November 14, 2013, to file and serve papers to show cause why this Court should not impose sanctions on J&J's counsel for disobedience of the scheduling order.(Case Management Deadline: 11/14/2013) (Fahrney, E)
|
April 13, 2012 |
Filing
20
ORDER Granting Leave to File Amended Answer, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/12/2012. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants, TAHIR JAMEEL BATH and UMARAN FAISAL BATH, are granted leaved to file the Amended Answer attached as Exhibit A to said Stipulation.)(Gaumnitz, R)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?