February 12, 2018 |
Filing
187
ORDER LIFTING STAY and ORDER GRANTING 45 Defendant Cal-Western Reconveyance's Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/9/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
|
January 14, 2016 |
Filing
179
ORDER On Motion To Approve Recording Of Lis Pendens And Order Striking Notice Of Pendency Of Action (Doc.Nos. 176 , 177 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/14/2016. (Fahrney, E)
|
October 30, 2014 |
Filing
156
ORDER on Defendant's 138 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER Dissoving Preliminary Injunction; ORDER for FINAL JUDGMENT under Rule 54(b); and ORDER for STATUS Report from Defendant Cal-Western, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/30/2014. (Kusamura, W)
|
October 9, 2014 |
Filing
154
ORDER VACATING Pre-Trial Conference and Trial Dates, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/9/2014. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the October 14, 2014 pre-trial conference and the November 18, 2014 trial dates are VACATED. Once the summary judgment motion has been ruled upon, the Court will reset the pre-trial conference and trial dates, if necessary.)(Gaumnitz, R)
|
September 23, 2014 |
Filing
152
ORDER for additional information and order vacating hearing date of 9/29/14. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/23/14. (Nazaroff, H)
|
September 4, 2014 |
Filing
146
ORDER on 145 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time and ORDER VACATING September 15, 2014 Hearing Date signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/4/2014. Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/15/2014. Reply due by 9/22/2014. Motion Hearing re Motion for Summary Judgment RESET for 9/29/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Pretrial Conference RESET for 10/14/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Jessen, A)
|
July 30, 2014 |
Filing
143
ORDER ; granting 142 Motion for Extension and vacating August 18, 2014 hearing date. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/30/14. (Nazaroff, H)
|
July 9, 2014 |
Filing
137
ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/9/14. (Verduzco, M)
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing
136
ORDER On Plaintiff's Motion To Alter Or Amend An Order And Order Striking Amended Objections (Doc.Nos. 129 , 130 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/27/2014. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiffs Rule 59(e) motion to alter or amend the Courts May 8, 2014 order (Doc. No. 129 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs amended objections (Doc. No. 130 ) is STRICKEN from the docket. (Fahrney, E)
|
June 25, 2014 |
Filing
135
ORDER Continuing Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/25/2014.(Settlement Conference set for 7/11/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Fahrney, E)
|
June 5, 2014 |
Filing
128
ORDER on 125 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Plaintiff's Motions to Alter and Vacate Deadlines and Scheduling Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/04/2014. (Flores, E)
|
May 16, 2014 |
Filing
125
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's Motions be Denied 106 , 108 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/15/14. Referred to Judge Ishii; 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
|
May 8, 2014 |
Filing
123
ORDER on Plaintiff's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's April 18, 2014 Ruling on Motions to Amend, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/7/14. (Verduzco, M)
|
April 18, 2014 |
Filing
117
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 91 and 98 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/17/2014. (Timken, A)
|
February 13, 2014 |
Filing
97
ORDER on Plaintiff's Objections to the December 6, 2013 Scheduling Order (Docs. 87 , 96 ), Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/13/2014. (Arellano, S.)
|
December 6, 2013 |
Filing
87
SCHEDULING ORDER (Fed. R. Civ. P. 16) signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/6/2013. (Any requests for leave to amend pleadings: 2/7/2014, Initial Disclosures: 12/20/2013, Non Expert Discovery: 6/6/2014, Expert Disclosure: 6/13/2014, Supp lemental Expert Disclosures: 6/27/2014, Expert Discovery: 7/11/2014, Non-Dispositive Motion Filing ddl: 7/14/2014, Non-Dispositive Motion Hrg ddl: 8/13/2014, Dispositive Motion Filing ddl: 7/14/2014, Dispositive Motion Hrg ddl: 8/18/2014, Settleme nt Conference set for 6/30/2014, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2014, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, and Bench Trial (2 days) set for 11/18/2014, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
November 1, 2013 |
Filing
82
ORDER on Plaintiff's Motions to Alter or Amend Orders 80 , 81 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/31/13. (Verduzco, M)
|
October 2, 2013 |
Filing
76
ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Defendants' Motion to Supplement, and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 64 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/1/13. (Verduzco, M)
|
May 16, 2013 |
Filing
68
ORDER VACATING May 15, 2013 Hearing and Taking Matter Under Submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/14/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
|
March 20, 2013 |
Filing
55
ORDER GRANTING Motion for Leave to File a Late Response to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 50 ) and Allowing Defendants to File Any Reply by March 26, 2013, Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/20/2013. (Arellano, S.)
|
September 14, 2012 |
Filing
49
ORDER vacating hearing date of 9/17/12 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/14/12. (Nazaroff, H)
|
June 28, 2012 |
Filing
39
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 13 & 31 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/27/2012. (Amended Complaint Due Within 21 Days.) (Marrujo, C)
|
June 25, 2012 |
Filing
38
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/22/2012. Amended Complaint Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Marrujo, C)
|
April 20, 2012 |
Filing
35
ORDER VACATING April 23, 2012 hearing date and taking matter under submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/19/2012. (Figueroa, O)
|
February 28, 2012 |
Filing
29
ORDER DENYING, without prejudice, plaintiff's request for entry of default as to defendant Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation, document 27 . The Court further PERMITS defendant Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation to file a responsive pleading within 21 days of the issuance of this order; order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/28/2012. (Rooney, M)
|
November 9, 2011 |
Filing
22
ORDER vacating hearing date of November 14, 2011 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/9/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
|
October 26, 2011 |
Filing
19
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii.) signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/26/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
|
September 23, 2011 |
Filing
10
ORDER DENYING 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/23/2011. (Arellano, S.)
|