Lanier v. Clovis Unified School District
Plaintiff: James M. Lanier
Defendant: Clovis Unified School District
Case Number: 1:2011cv01613
Filed: September 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER On Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment (Doc. 71 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/6/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Fahrney, E)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER to DENY Relief and to TERM 94 Motion signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/20/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER VACATING 92 Order on Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Time and 89 Amended Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/17/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER RE: Plaintiff's 58 Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Requests for Production of Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/7/2013. (Martinez, A)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER to Appear for Deposition and to Shorten Time to File a Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/5/2013. (Martinez, A)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 44 Request for Continuance IN PART signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/25/2013. The amended non-expert discovery deadline is April 15, 2013. Thus, all non-expert discovery including the adjudication of all discovery motions must be completed by April 15, 2013. All other deadlines and other orders outlined in this Court's scheduling order issued on July 9, 2012, remain in full force and effect. (Doc. 43 ).(Martinez, A)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Setting Date for Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's 44 Request for Continuance; ORDER VACATING 47 Order Signed on February 15, 2013 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/20/2013. (Martinez, A)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Requiring That Plaintiff Submit Additional Medical Evidence signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/30/2013. (Martinez, A)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/1/2012. Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 6/6/2012 is CONTINUED to 7/9/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin.(Bradley, A)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER on Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion for Reconsideration 25 , 29 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/18/12: The April 24, 2012 hearing is VACATED; The Court GRANTS parties' request to take judicial notice; Mr. Lanier's motion for reconsideration is DISMISSED in part and DENIED in part; and Clovis Unified's motion to dismiss is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/21/2012 vacating hearing and terminating 12 , 13 Motions to Dismiss. (Defendants Response due by 4/5/2012).(Lundstrom, T)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING Scheduling Confernce; ORDER REQUIRING Parties to Complete Consent or Decline Form Within Fifteen Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/2/12: Initial Scheduling Conference set for June 6, 2012 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin.(Hellings, J)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Service By The United States Marshal Without Prepayment Of Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/22/2011. (Fahrney, E)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Adopting 4 Findings and Recommendations in Full, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/6/11. (Gonzalez, R)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/1/2011. Objections to F&R due by 12/5/2011. (Bradley, A)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/27/2011. (Bradley, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanier v. Clovis Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clovis Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?