Rapalo v. Lopez, et al.
Plaintiff: Walter Rapalo
Defendant: S. Lopez, Huang, - Schaffer, Shittu, A. Manasrah, I Grewel and L. Bluford
Case Number: 1:2011cv01695
Filed: October 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Partially Granting Plaintiff's 129 Motion for Extension of Time to Object to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/27/117. Objections Due: 05/01/2017. (Gonzalez, R)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's unauthorized surreply 122 be STRICKEN from the record; Defendants Lopez and Manasrah's Motion for Summary Judgment 94 be Granted re 94 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by S. Lopez, A. Manasrah ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/8/17. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's 100 Motion for the Court to Appoint a Neutral Expert for Summary Judgment be Denied; Plaintif's Motion to Strike be Denied and Defendant Schaefer's 93 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/03/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 3/20/2017.(Flores, E)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 77 Motion Requesting Leave to Depose a Non-Party by Written Deposition, and Request to Serve Subpoena signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/11/2016. (Flores, E)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 84 Motion for Reconsideration by District Court of Magistrate Judge's Ruling of ECF No. 72 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/4/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To Amend (ECF No. 59 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/27/2015. (Fahrney, E)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 52 Motion for Leave to Amend and File a Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/9/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 44 Application for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/15. (Marrujo, C)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 36 Motion to Compel Production of Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/07/2014. (Flores, E)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Defendants' 38 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/17/2014. Dispositive Motions filed by 1/16/2015.(Flores, E)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Denying 34 Motion for Subpoenaed Documents without Cost, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/18/14. (Verduzco, M)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Denying 30 Motion for Appointment of Counsel without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/15/14. (Verduzco, M)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/28/2012. (Flores, E)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to FILE Consent or Decline Form or SHOW CAUSE Why this Action should not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute; Twenty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/19/2012. Show Cause Response due by 2/13/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rapalo v. Lopez, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Rapalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shittu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Manasrah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I Grewel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Bluford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?