Ransom v. Herrera et al

Plaintiff: Leonard Ransom, Jr.
Defendant: Danny Herrera, Ricky Brannum, L. Castro and Alan Davis
Case Number: 1:2011cv01709
Filed: October 13, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2018 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Admonishing Plaintiff for Improper Conduct 160 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/13/2018. (Hellings, J)
August 7, 2018 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendants' Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiff and Extension of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures 191 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/7/2018. (Hellings, J)
June 14, 2018 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation's Request for an Extension of Time to Serve Responses to Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum 171 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/14/2018. (Hellings, J)
May 15, 2018 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding S. Kernan's Motion to Quash Subpoena, or Alternatively, Issue Protective Order 122 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/14/2018. (Hellings, J)
May 10, 2018 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Payment for Service of Subpoenas 123 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/10/2018. (Hellings, J)
May 7, 2018 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendants' First Request for an Extension of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures and Extending Related Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/7/2018. (Hellings, J)
May 4, 2018 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Letter Dated April 24, 2018 149 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/3/2018: Plaintiff's request for an order directing the litigation coordinator at High Desert State Prison (or the Warden) to deduct the funds from his trust account and forward them to the Marshal is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
April 23, 2018 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Defendants' Request for Clarification Regarding Due Date for Plaintiff's Discovery Responses 141 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/23/2018. (Hellings, J)
April 17, 2018 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Settlement Conference and Appointing Limited Purpose Counsel for Purposes of Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/17/2018: Settlement Conference set 7/17/2018 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison at High Desert State Prison. (Hellings, J)
April 6, 2018 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: Plaintiff's Letter signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/06/2018. Responses due by 5/9/2018.(Flores, E)
April 5, 2018 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Discovery and Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/05/2018. Opposition due by 4/11/2018. (Flores, E)
March 23, 2018 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Defendants' Request for Clarification of March 19, 2018 Minute Order 126 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/23/2018. (Hellings, J)
February 28, 2018 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion and Request for Service of Subpoenas by United States Marshal Service 115 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/28/2018. (Hellings, J)
February 13, 2018 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Service of Subpoenas by United States Marshals Service at Cost to Plaintiff and Directing Service of Subpoenas by the United States Marshals Service Without Prepayment of Costs 100 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/12/2018: 20-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 26, 2018 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Re Inmate Leonard Ransom, Jr., CDCR #D-13703 for Video Conference set for 2/22/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/25/2018. (Hellings, J)
January 17, 2018 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Defendants' 96 Motion for Stay of discovery pending outcome of February 22, 2018 Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/17/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
December 18, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING Defendants' Objections to Discovery Order 88 and 90 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/18/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 15, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/14/2017. (Timken, A)
November 13, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 81 Plaintiff's Request signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/9/2017. (Jessen, A)
August 2, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 76 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER For this Action to Proceed Against Defendants Brannum and Herrera on Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment Procedural Due Process Claim, Fourteenth Amendment Substantive Due Process Claim Under Devereaux, Retaliation Claim, Section 1983 Malicious Prosecution Claim, and Conspiracy Claim, and Dismissing All Other Claims and Defendants, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/1/17. ; J. Castro (Lieutenant) terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
June 30, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That the Case Procced Against Defendants Brannum and Herrera on a Fourteenth Amendment Procedural Due Process Claim, a Fourteenth Amendment Substantive Due Process Claim Under Devereaux, a Retaliation Claim, a Section 1983 Malicious Prosecution Claim, and a Conspiracy Claim, and That All Other Claims and Defendants Be Dismissed With Prejudice 72 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/30/17: 20-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 1, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 73 Request for Screening and Setting Deadline for Responsive Pleading signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/1/2017. (Jessen, A)
December 28, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) 32 & 38 Motions to Dismiss be Granted, With Leave to Amend; ORDER GRANTING 57 Motion Defendant Brannum's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Clarification a nd Objection to Defendant Brannum's Reply In Support of Defendant Brannum's Motion to Dismiss; ORDER DENYING Defendant Castro and Herrera's Request for Judicial Notice 32 -2, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/27/16. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days.(Marrujo, C)
October 19, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendant Brannum's Motion to Dismiss 54 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/19/16. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
September 26, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Copy of Defendant Brannum's Motion to Dismiss and GRANTING Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant Brannum's Motion to Dismiss 50 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/26/16: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
September 1, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendant Brannum's Motion to Dismiss within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/31/2016. (Flores, E)
July 1, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 36 , 36 Motions to Extend Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/30/16. Thirty Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
January 5, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Service by the United States Marshal, without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/4/15. (Verduzco, M)
August 14, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 8 Motion for Refund of Filing Fee, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/13/14. (Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ransom v. Herrera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Ransom, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Brannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?