February 1, 2018 |
Filing
291
ORDER ADOPTING 282 Findings and Recommendations and Granting Defendant Perez's 230 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/31/18. (Marrujo, C)
|
January 30, 2018 |
Filing
290
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Defendant Enenmoh's 232 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/29/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
|
January 19, 2018 |
Filing
287
ORDER for Defendant Enenmoh to Submit Exhibit B to Dr. Barnett's Declaration in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Filed on May 9, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/19/18. Fourteen Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
|
January 8, 2018 |
Filing
285
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's 278 Motion to Strike and DENYING 276 Request for Judicial Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/8/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
December 21, 2017 |
Filing
283
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Defendant Page's Motion for Summary Judgment Be Granted 234 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/21/2017: 14-Day Objection Deadline. (Hellings, J)
|
December 12, 2017 |
Filing
282
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant Perez's 230 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted; Objections, if any, Due within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/11/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 12/29/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
|
November 15, 2017 |
Filing
275
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant Adair's 224 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted; Objections, if any, Due within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/15/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 12/4/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
|
October 10, 2017 |
Filing
267
ORDER DENYING 261 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/10/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
|
September 5, 2017 |
Filing
264
ORDER GRANTING 255 Defendant Page's Motion to Strike; ORDER STRIKING 251 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Page's Motion for Summary Judgment for Exceeding Page Limits; and ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Thirty (30) Days in Which to File a New Opposition Not Exceeding 25 Pages signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/4/2017. (Jessen, A)
|
July 28, 2017 |
Filing
260
ORDER GRANTING Defendant Adair's Motion for Extension of Time, Nunc Pro Tunc 229 ; ORDER DEEMING Defendant Adair's Motion for Summary Judgment Timely Filed on April 14, 2017 224 ; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time, Nunc Pro Tunc 233 ; ORDER DEEMING Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Timely Filed on May 30, 2017 238 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/28/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
|
June 6, 2017 |
Filing
240
ORDER re Plaintiff's Motion for Ruling, Clarification, and Enlargement re 227 , 236 ; ORDER for Plaintiff to File an Opposition to Defendant Adair's Motion for Extension of Time 229 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/5/17. 21-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
|
May 4, 2017 |
Filing
228
ORDER DENYING 208 Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant Perez-Hernandez, with Leave to Amend; Deadline: June 16, 2017; Plaintiff's Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition Due on or Before July 10, 2017; Defendant's Reply Due on or Before July 21, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/4/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
|
April 18, 2017 |
Filing
225
ORDER for Defendant Perez-Hernandez to Submit Table of Contents for Exhibits to Request for Judicial Notice Within Fourteen Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/18/17. (Marrujo, C)
|
April 13, 2017 |
Filing
223
ORDER Denying 68 Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendants Enenmoh and Page as Moot, with Leave to Amend within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/13/2017. (Flores, E)
|
January 20, 2017 |
Filing
220
ORDER DENYING 195 Plaintiff's Motion to be Relieved of Claim Requirement of California Government Code 946.6 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/20/2017. (Jessen, A)
|
July 29, 2016 |
Filing
190
ORDER regarding 185 Motion to Compel and 189 Motion to Disregard signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/29/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
|
July 22, 2016 |
Filing
188
ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's 186 187 Motions for Clarification and/or Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/22/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
|
July 6, 2016 |
Filing
184
ORDER regarding 183 Motion Request for Clarification signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/6/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
|
June 7, 2016 |
Filing
176
ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 175 Motion for Clafication, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/7/16. Motion to Depose Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
|
April 28, 2016 |
Filing
172
ORDER Directing Personal Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum Within Seven Days by United States Marshal Without Prepayment of Costs, re 169 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/27/16. (Gonzalez, R)
|
February 25, 2016 |
Filing
162
ORDER Directing Personal Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum within Seven Days by United States Marshal without Prepayment of Costs signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 02/24/2016. (Flores, E)
|
February 9, 2016 |
Filing
160
ORDER DENYING 159 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/8/2016. (Jessen, A)
|
January 26, 2016 |
Filing
158
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Compel (ECF Nos. 132 , 134 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/26/2016. (Fahrney, E)
|
January 20, 2016 |
Filing
157
ORDER and Notice Authorizing 147 Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum Directing Production of Documents by C.S.AT.F. Director of Nursing; ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Serve Copy of Subpoena with Order; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 152 Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum; ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's 150 Motion for Order to Show Cause and/or Sanctions signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 01/19/2016. (Flores, E)
|
August 25, 2015 |
Filing
135
ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Summons Package and GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint Naming Doe Defendant 133 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/25/15: Thirty-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
|
May 29, 2015 |
Filing
125
ORDER DISCHARGING 122 Order to Show Cause; ORDER GRANTING Defendant Page Thirty Days to Respond to Initial Discovery Requests, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/29/2015. (Marrujo, C)
|
January 5, 2015 |
Filing
116
ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 113 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/5/15: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
|
December 29, 2014 |
Filing
115
ORDER Dismissing 96 Motion Directing Personal Service; ORDER Denying 106 Motion for Third Part Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/25/14. (Gonzalez, R)
|
November 7, 2014 |
Filing
103
ORDER DIRECTING Personal Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum Within Seven Days by United States Marshal Without Prepayment of Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/6/2014. (Marrujo, C)
|
September 17, 2014 |
Filing
93
ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motions (ECF Nos. 39 , 45 , 47 , 48 , 53 , 62 , 64 , 74 , 75 , 82 , 83 , 84 ), 87 , 91 ), ORDER Regarding Defendants' Motion To Take Deposition As Moot (ECF No. 41 ), ORDER Denying Motion For Summary Judgment Wi thout Prejudice To Refiling (ECF No. 68 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/17/2014. Plaintiffs motions (ECF Nos. 39 , 45 , 47 , 48 , 53 , 62 , 64 , 74 , 75 , 82 , 83 , 84 , 87 , 91 ) are DENIED. Defendants motion to take Plaintiffs deposition by videoconference is DENIED as moot. Defendants motion for summary judgment is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling at the conclusion of discovery. (Fahrney, E)
|
April 11, 2014 |
Filing
58
ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion To Modify The Discovery And Scheduling Order To Extend The Dispositive Motion Deadline (ECF No. 56 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/11/2014. (Fahrney, E)
|
November 21, 2013 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/20/2013 denying Motion for Extension of Time as moot re 30 , 35 . (Lundstrom, T)
|
October 4, 2013 |
Filing
28
ORDER Denying 25 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/4/13. (Verduzco, M)
|
October 31, 2012 |
Filing
15
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/30/12. (Gonzalez, R)
|
December 8, 2011 |
Filing
9
ORDER dismissing case 1:11-cv-1917-GSA-pc as duplicative of this case signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/8/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
|
November 18, 2011 |
Filing
6
ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 3 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/18/11: Motion is DENIED, without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
|