Solis v. National Emergency Medical Services Association

Plaintiff: Hilda L. Solis
Defendant: National Emergency Medical Services Association
Case Number: 1:2011cv01929
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Reporting & Disclosure Act
Cause of Action: 29:0401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT re 51 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/2/13. (Gonzalez, R)
April 29, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/26/13. (Gonzalez, R)
March 26, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 24 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/26/2013. (Figueroa, O)
March 1, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court Plaintiff's status report; ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/1/2013. (Status Report or a certification of the election Deadline: 4/26/2013) (Figueroa, O)
November 9, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/9/12.(Case Management Deadline: 1/31/2013 and Filing Deadline: 2/28/2013.) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 11, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice and ORDER for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant, National Emergency Medical Services Association, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/11/12. Former Attorney: Gary G. Goyette; New Attorney: Geoffrey O. Evers. (Verduzco, M)
May 9, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing Date of May 14, 2012 and Taking Matter Under Submission, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/8/12. (Verduzco, M)
April 10, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 15 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/10/12. Denied. (Gonzalez, R)
March 23, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing the Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 24 ), Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/23/2012. The Motion Hearing now set for 4/10/2012 before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill is RESET to 5/14/2012 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm. 2 before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Arellano, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solis v. National Emergency Medical Services Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Emergency Medical Services Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda L. Solis
Represented By: Glen Frederick Dorgan, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?