Nastrom et al v. New Century Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jamey L Nastrom and Kim M Hewton-Nastrom
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Chase Home Finance LLC, JP Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc., Stewart Title of California, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and New Century Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2011cv01998
Filed: November 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate the Order Dismissing Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, document 57 , and VACATING the hearing re same currently scheduled for 1/25/2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 1/22/2013. (Rooney, M)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING 66 Defendant's Request for Telephonic Appearance at the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate, currently scheduled for 1/25/2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 1/14/2013. (Hernandez, M)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 44 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/13/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING Ex Parte Application for Order Allowing Filing of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/15/2012. (Hernandez, M)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 12 22 Motion to Dismiss; Amended Complaint due within 60 days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/8/2012. Amended Complaint due by 8/7/2012.(Figueroa, O)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying 28 Request To File Electronically, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/4/2012. (Gaumnitz, R)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/2/12. Case assigned for all purposes to Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck; New case number 1:11-cv-01998-DLB. This Order Corrects Defendants Named in Order 20 .(Verduzco, M)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Failure to Obey Order, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/24/2012. Show Cause Response due by 3/3/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to File Papers as to Magistrate Judge Consent, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/14/12. (Verduzco, M)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Adopting 5 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding DENIAL of Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/11/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Denial of 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/7/2011. Matter referred to Judge O'Neill. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:11-cv-3109 KJM CKD (PS)) to Fresno (1:11-cv-1998 LJO DLB (PS)) signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/2/11. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nastrom et al v. New Century Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Golareh Mahdavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Golareh Mahdavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Represented By: Golareh Mahdavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc.
Represented By: Golareh Mahdavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Golareh Mahdavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Century Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamey L Nastrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim M Hewton-Nastrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?