Hall et al v. Mims et al
Plaintiff: Quentin Hall, Robert Merryman, Dawn Singh and Carlton Fields
Defendant: Margaret Mims, Edward Moreno, M.D., George Laird, Ph.D., Pratap Narayen, M.D., Rick Hill and Marilynn Weldon
Case Number: 1:2011cv02047
Filed: December 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER on Stipulation for Attorneys' Fees 207 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/3/2018. (Hellings, J)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Joint Request for Appointment of Court Expert and ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/11/16. (Marrujo, C)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER on Joint Request for Appointment of Court Expert, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/10/16: The Court APPROVES the appointment of Dr. Michael Puisis as Court expert to be paid by Defendant in the amount of $295 an hour for work performed and $142.50 an hour for time spent traveling. Defendant will also reimburse him for reasonable travel expenses. (Hellings, J)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER re Dominic Hannna's 189 Motion for Reconsideration of 188 Order Denying Motion to Intervene and Unseal Court Records, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/1/2016. (Hanna's motion to unseal the expert reports is DENIED and his motion to intervene is DENIED AS MOOT. Accordingly, his motion for reconsideration (Doc. 189) is DENIED.) (Gaumnitz, R)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER For Supplemental Briefing, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/8/2016. (Filing Deadline: 1/15/2016) (Fahrney, E)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER DENYING Dominic Hanna's Motion to Intervene and Unseal Court Records (Doc. 177). (1) Hannas Motion to Intervene for the limited purpose of filing a Motion to Unseal is hereby DENIED as MOOT; (2) To the extent Hannas motion seeks an order unsealing the expert reports of: (1) Dr. Michael Puisis regarding Fresno County Jails medical program, (2) Richard Hayward, Ph.D., regarding Fresno County Jails mental health program, and (3) David Rardin, regarding Fresno County Jails Operations Review, the motion is DENIED. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/11/2015. (Herman, H)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Docs. 113 and 170). Referred to Judge O'Neill; within 14 days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations, any party may file written objections wi th the Court. The parties are advised that if they do not object these Recommendations, each counsel shall file of a statement of non-opposition, as this will shorten the objection period and facilitate the adjudication of this motion by the District Judge. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/7/2015. (Herman, H)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER ADOPTING 129 Findings and Recommendations In Full, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/21/2015. (Marrujo, C)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days of service of this recommendation, any party may file written objections to thes e findings and recommendations with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. The parties are advised that if they do not object these Recommendations, each counsel shall file of a statement of non-opposition, as this will shorten the objection period and facilitate the adjudication of this motion by the District Judge. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/1/2015. (Herman, H)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Granting Joint Request to SEAL Documents (Doc. 122). Directing Clerk to File Documents Under Seal. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/8/2015. (Herman, H)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/2/2015. (Herman, H)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER AFTER Hearing. On November 19, 2014, the parties appeared through counsel for a telephonic status conference on the progress of settlement negotiations. Having heard the positions of the parties and good cause appearing therefore in order to a ssure timely resolution of the negotiations, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before December 5, 2014, Defendant shall serve on Plaintiffs counsel a written response to Plaintiffs proposed Remedial Plan. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the next telephonic status conference shall be held on December 15, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall submit a joint status conference statement on or before December 11, 2014. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/21/2014. (Herman, H)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Brian Murphy on November 26, 2012 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/21/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/16/12. The County of Fresno is substituted in place of Margaret Mims, Edward Moreno, George Laird, Pratap Narayen, Rick Hill, and Marilynn Weldon in this action. Plaintiffs Sharon Chavez and Carlton Fields are dismissed without prejudice. (Verduzco, M)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER on Protective Order (re 48 Stipulation), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/7/2012. (Herman, H)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION for Leave of Court for Defendants to Take Depositions of Plaintiffs; ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/5/2012. (Herman, H)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER Modifying Preliminary Scheduling Order to Set Last Day to Serve Initial Disclosures: by 7/31/2012. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/11/2012. (Herman, H)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER extending time to file answer to first amended complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/30/2012. (Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Deadline: 6/1/2012) (Figueroa, O)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT 20 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 16, 2012. (Munoz, I)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Limited Discovery 18 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/27/2012. (Herman, H)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing Mandatory Scheduling Conference: last day for Defendants to file a responsive pleading is 4/10/2012 (NOTE: document had a typo with date of 4/10/2010). Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 2/29/12 to Monday, May 7, 2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/21/2012. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Mims et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentin Hall
Represented By: Maureen Alger
Represented By: Andrew N. Berk
Represented By: Melinda R. Bird
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Kelley
Represented By: Kelly Jean Knapp
Represented By: Rachel Anne Scherer
Represented By: Donald Specter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Merryman
Represented By: Maureen Alger
Represented By: Andrew N. Berk
Represented By: Melinda R. Bird
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Kelley
Represented By: Kelly Jean Knapp
Represented By: Rachel Anne Scherer
Represented By: Donald Specter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Singh
Represented By: Maureen Alger
Represented By: Andrew N. Berk
Represented By: Melinda R. Bird
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Kelley
Represented By: Kelly Jean Knapp
Represented By: Rachel Anne Scherer
Represented By: Donald Specter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Fields
Represented By: Maureen Alger
Represented By: Andrew N. Berk
Represented By: Melinda R. Bird
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Kelley
Represented By: Kelly Jean Knapp
Represented By: Rachel Anne Scherer
Represented By: Donald Specter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Moreno, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Laird, Ph.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratap Narayen, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilynn Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?