Ali v. Capital One
Plaintiff: Karima Ali
Defendant: Capital One
Case Number: 1:2011cv02115
Filed: December 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT, with Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/25/2012. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.'s 26 Motion for Leave to Allow Party Representative to Appear Telephonically at the Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/15/2012. (Marrujo, C)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER on Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration 15 ; ORDER Amending April 11, 2012 Order, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/30/12. (Hellings, J)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on Defendant's 11 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/10/2012. Answer to Ms. Ali's Complaint Due no Later Than April 30, 2012. (Marrujo, C)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on Defendant's 6 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/27/2012. Amended Complaint due by 2/29/2012.(Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Capital One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karima Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One
Represented By: Hunter Randolph Eley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?