Dorroh v. Deerbrook Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Robert Dorroh and Barbara Dorroh
Defendant: Deerbrook Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2011cv02120
Filed: December 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/9/2016 granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 169 , 170 and denying Plaintiffs' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment 171 . (Lundstrom, T)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER adopting the parties' stipulation to amend the scheduling order, in part, as follows: 1) The current deadline of February 15, 2016, for Plaintiff Cedar Sol Warren to serve expert reports is hereby extended to March 7, 2016; 2) The current March 31, 2016, deadline to take depositions of Warren's experts shall be extended to April 8, 2016; and 3) The current May 2, 2016, deadline to serve rebuttal expert reports shall be extended to May 6, 2016. All other dates and orders in the Scheduling Order issued on January 25, 2016, document 165 , remain in full force and effect. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/7/2016. (Rooney, M)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER RE: Reopening Discovery re 135 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/16/2015. (Martinez, A)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Permitting Substitution of Party, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/18/2015. (Warren is granted permission to substitute in as a plaintiff in this case. The parties are directed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Austin within 30 days to determine how this case should proceed, if an amended complaint is appropriate, if additional discovery is warranted, and to set up a new schedule. The pending 109 111 motions for summary judgment are denied without prejudice to refiling.) (Gaumnitz, R)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER VACATING trial date and all associated dates, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/22/2013. The trial date of June 11, 2013 is vacated. (Figueroa, O)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER VACATING hearing date of February 25, 2013 and taking matter under submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/20/2013. (Plaintiff's update of status of appeal Deadline: 3/11/2013)(Figueroa, O)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Re: 93 Motion Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/16/2013. (The Dorrohs and Warrens motions to substitute in as plaintiff/reconsideration are DENIED.) (Gaumnitz, R)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER VACATING hearing date of December 17, 2012 and taking matter under submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/12/2012. (Figueroa, O)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER SETTING Briefing Schedule, Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/27/2012. The court deems Warrens filing (Doc. 94 ) a motion for reconsideration. Defendant may file an opposition by 4:00 PM on December 10, 2012. (Arellano, S.)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 AMENDED ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 86 Motion to Shorten Time signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/28/2012. (Bradley, A)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 83 Ex Parte Application to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines in This Case signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/25/2012. (Bradley, A)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes 64 , 66 , 67 , and 75 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/21/2012. (Bradley, A)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Regarding Recently Filed Discovery Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/23/2012. Non-Expert discovery deadline is continued to 9/28/2012; Hearing on Motions 64 , 66 , 67 , currently set for 8/10/2012 is continued to 9/7/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA).(Bradley, A)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re 61 Stipulation to (1) Continue the Hearing on Deerbrook's Motion for Summary Judgment and (2) Withdraw Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Vacating Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Continuing that Motion, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/10/12. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorroh v. Deerbrook Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deerbrook Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: Charles P. Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dorroh
Represented By: Aaron Benjamin Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Dorroh
Represented By: Aaron Benjamin Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?