Lopez v. Shiesha et al
Plaintiff: Clay Edward Lopez
Defendant: M. Stainer, Lagham, S. Shiesha, M. Ross, Baker and M. Thompson
Case Number: 1:2012cv00076
Filed: January 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Request For Status (ECF No. 26 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/24/2014. (Fahrney, E)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to Comply With a Court Order 23 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/21/13: Clerk Shall Close the Case. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Case should not be Dismissed without Prejudice for Failure to Comply with Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 09/17/2013. Show Cause Response due by 10/7/2013. (Flores, E)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Certain Claims and Defendants Should not be Dismissed for Failure to Comply with Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/4/13. 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 16 Motion to Supplement the First Amended Complaint and Denying, without Prejudice, Injunctive Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/21/2012. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Shiesha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Stainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lagham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Shiesha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clay Edward Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?