Patterson v. Kern County Sheriff's Officer
Plaintiff: James R. Patterson
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff's Officer
Case Number: 1:2012cv00132
Filed: January 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATION To Dismiss Action With Prejudice For Failure To Obey Court Order And Failure To Prosecute (ECF No. 39 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/11/2014. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 3/3/2014.(Fahrney, E)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to file opposition to 35 MOTION to DISMISS signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/10/2014. (Filing Deadline: 2/6/2014).(Lundstrom, T)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement the Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/20/2012. (Jessen, A)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/26/2012 denying 8 MOTION to Seek Compensation for Punitive Damages and Mental, Medical Relief. (Lundstrom, T)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:12-cv-0198 EFB) to Fresno (1:12-cv-0132 MJS) signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/30/12. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Kern County Sheriff's Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff's Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?