Spivey v. McDonald
Petitioner: W. C. Spivey
Respondent: M. McDonald
Case Number: 1:2012cv00206
Filed: February 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying 45 Motion for Certificate of Appealability signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/01/2016. (Flores, E)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and to Enter Judgment for Respondent; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Decline to Issue a Certificate of Appealability, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/23/15. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Dismissing Petitioner's Motion For Clarification (Doc. 38 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/2/2014. (Fahrney, E)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re Findings and Recommendations 35 ; ORDER Denying Petitioner's Motion for a Stay 30 , 12 , 34 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/17/13. (Verduzco, M)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Vacating The Court's Dismissal Of Petitioner's Motion For A Stay (Docs. 29 , 12 ), ORDER Deeming Petitioner's Motion For Leave To File An Amended Petition To Be A Motion For A Stay Of The Proceedings (Docs. 30 , 12 ), FINDING S And RECOMMENDATIONS To Deny Petitioner's Motion For A Stay (Docs. 30 , 12 ), Objections Deadline: Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/23/2013. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 9/30/2013.(Fahrney, E)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Dismissing as Moot Petitioner's 12 Motion for Stay of the Proceedings; ORDER Requiring Petitioner to File any Motion to Amend the Petition no Later than Forty-Five (45) Days after the Date of Service of this Order; ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for any Motion to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 01/16/2013. Motion to Amend due by 3/6/2013. (Flores, E)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Petitioner to File a Signed and Dated Verification of the Petition no Later than Thirty (30) Days after Service of this Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/20/12. (Verduzco, M)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/14/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spivey v. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: W. C. Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?