Archer et al v. City of Taft, Ca. Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Darrell Archer and Keitha Darquea
Defendant: City of Taft, Ca. Inc., Dave Noerr, Randy Miller, Craig Noble, Paul Linder, Cliff Thompson, Bob Gorson, Craig Jones, Orchel Krier, Ron Waldrop, Jill Gipson, David Prentice, Louise Hudgens, J.E. Burke Construction Inc. and Joseph Burke
Case Number: 1:2012cv00261
Filed: February 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER DENYING 162 Plaintiffs' Motion for Post-Judgment Discovery Related to Defendants' Finances, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/9/2020. (Hall, S)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER GRANTING 153 Counsels' Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys of Record for Plaintiffs, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/19/2017. (Hall, S)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER DENYING 134 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/18/2016. (Jessen, A)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 127 128 Motions for Attorneys' Fees, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/28/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER ON Defendants' Motions in Limine 89 , 91 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/8/15: First Motion in Limine 89 is DENIED; Second Motion in Limine 91 is GRANTED. (Hellings, J)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER GRANTING 92 93 Substitution of Attorneys, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/6/2015. (Hall, S)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 72 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/28/15. (Verduzco, M)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING 66 Plaintiffs' Motion Continue the Deposition of Defendant Jill Gipson, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/14/2014. (Hall, S)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING 57 Plaintiffs' Motion to Show Cause, Contempt of Court, Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/2/2014. (Hall, S)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING 47 Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue the Deposition of Defendant Jill Gipson, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/30/2014. The hearing date of 7/22/2014 is VACATED. (Hall, S)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING 37 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/17/2014. (Hall, S)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER 40 Setting Aside the Entry of Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/5/2014. Defaults entered against Defendants Joseph Burke and J.E. Constructions, Inc. on January 31, 2014, are SET ASIDE. (Hall, S)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING 38 Plaintiffs' Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/27/2014. (Jessen, A)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER STRIKING 13 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/17/2014. Second Amended Complaint 13 is stricken. Answer filed by Jill Gipson 17 is deemed responsive to the First Amended Complaint. (Hall, S)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/15/2014. Consent/Decline Deadline 4/28/2014. Pleading Amendment Deadline 7/14/2014. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 10/24/2014; Expert 1/7/2015; Mid-Discovery Status Conferenc e set for 7/10/2014 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 1/20/2015; Hearing by 2/17/2015. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 3/3/2015 ; Hearing by 4/14/2015. Settlement Conference set for 1/21/2015 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING 7 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/11/2012. Louise Hudgens, Craig Jones, Orchel Krier, Paul Linder, Randy Miller, Craig Noble, Dave Noerr, David Prentice, Cliff Thompson, Ron Waldrop, City of Taft, Ca. Inc. and Bob Gorson terminated. (Jessen, A)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Dismissing Certain Claims And Defendants,ORDER Directing Clerk Of The Court To Issue Summons, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/21/2012.F&R;s referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Objections to F&R due by 9/7/2012) (Fahrney, E)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiffs to File a Second Amended Complaint or Notify the Court of Their Willingness to Proceed Only on Claims Found to be Cognizable, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/1/2012. (Hall, S)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/26/2012. Amended Complaint due by 5/17/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archer et al v. City of Taft, Ca. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keitha Darquea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Taft, Ca. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Noerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Linder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Gorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orchel Krier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Prentice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise Hudgens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.E. Burke Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?