Lamon v. Amrheign et al

Plaintiff: Barry Louis Lamon
Defendant: B. Amrheign, Austin, Brad, J. Bondogi, T. Cano, E. Clark, K. Cribbs, J. Jones, L. Nelson and L. Schultz
Case Number: 1:2012cv00296
Filed: February 28, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2018 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 114 Motion for the Court's Assistance Regarding Failure to Pay Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/08/2018. (Flores, E)
March 27, 2018 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's 114 Motion Regarding Failure to Pay Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/27/18. Response to Motion Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
January 25, 2018 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 108 Motion Concerning Terms of Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 01/25/2018. (Flores, E)
December 8, 2017 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's 108 Motion Regarding Terms of Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/07/2017. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
November 27, 2017 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to CLOSE CASE Pursuant to Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal, with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/27/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
November 20, 2017 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Inmate Barry Louis Lamon, CDCR# E-08345 is no Longer Needed as a Participant in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/17/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
November 6, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Defendant Amrhein, without Prejudice, for Failure to Effectuate Service signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/06/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd; Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
October 16, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/15/2017 recommending dismissal of Defendant, Schultz without prejudice for the failure to effectuate service re 94 . Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 11/2/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
October 11, 2017 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference on November 17, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/11/2017. Settlement Conference set for 11/17/2017 at 09:00 AM at CSP-Corcoran before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Sant Agata, S)
September 29, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD ORDER Directing Service of Defendant Schultz by the United States Marshals Service without Prepayment of Costs signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/27/2017. (Flores, E)
September 25, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 88 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/25/2017. (Flores, E)
September 11, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding 64 66 67 74 83 Motions to Facilitate Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendants; ORDER Denying Motions to Stay Proceedings and Motion for Assistance in Obtaining Records, as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/11/2017. (Flores, E)
September 6, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 80 Findings and Recommendations, and DENYING 71 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/5/17. (Marrujo, C)
July 25, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 71 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, and Request for Judicial Notice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/24/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. (Flores, E)
January 30, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 63 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Denying 52 55 Motions signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/30/2017. (Flores, E)
November 21, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, filed June 30, 2016 52 , be DENIED and Plaintiff's first Motion for an Order of Protection, filed August 8, 2016 55 , be DENIED ;referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/21/2016. Objections to F&R due (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 27, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 54 57 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete and Return USM 285 Forms to the Court signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/26/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
May 19, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Return USM 285 Forms, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/19/16. Response Due in Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
February 12, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 41 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in Part, Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/12/2016. (Flores, E)
September 22, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS That This Action Proceed Against Defendants Austin, Wilson and Yzguerra and That the Remaining Defendants be Dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/22/2015, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
October 29, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 29 Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's Order; ORDER for Plaintiff to Comply with Magistrate Judge's 28 Order of August 12, 2014 within Thirty Days, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/29/14. Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
January 31, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Of January 11, 2013 (Doc. 12 ), ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request To Stay Action (Doc. 13 ), ORDER Granting Extension Of Time For Plaintiff To File Amended Complaint, Ninety Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/30/2013. (Fahrney, E)
January 11, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS That This Action Be Dismissed For Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief Could Be Granted, Objections Due In Twenty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/11/2013. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 2/4/2013. (Fahrney, E)
May 8, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 9 Motion for Protective Order as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/08/2012. (Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamon v. Amrheign et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Louis Lamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Amrheign
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Bondogi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Cribbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?