Perry v. Garcia et al
Plaintiff: Lewis Perry
Defendant: John Garcia, Freeman, Felix, A. Lonigra, Kamala Harris and R.H. Trimble
Case Number: 1:2012cv00312
Filed: February 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER (1) DISMISSING ACTION, With Prejudice, for Failure to Prosecute and (2) DENYING 41 Pending Motion as Moot signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/22/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition re 41 Motion for Summary Judgment Within Twenty-One Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/22/2015. (Jessen, A)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Lifting Stay, Amending Scheduling Order, and Directing Clerk's Office to Send Copies, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/10/2014. (Jessen, A)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Staying Scheduling Order and Requiring Defendant to File Status Report On or Before June 11, 2014, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/12/14. (Verduzco, M)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DIRECTING 20 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BE FILED; FINDING SERVICE OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT APPROPRIATE ON EIGHTH AMENDMENT CLAIM AGAINST NGUYEN AND DISMISSING OTHER CLAIMS AND DEFENDANTS, WITH PREJUDICE signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/5/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED, With Prejudice, Based on Plaintiff's Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted Under Section 1983 re 12 First Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/22/2013. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:12-cv-0442 DAD PC) to Fresno (1:12-cv-0312 SKO PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/29/2012; this court has not ruled on plaintiff's request to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Lonigra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.H. Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?