McCarn v. HSBC USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lucas E. McCarn
Defendant: HSBC USA, Inc., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Mortgage Corporation, HSBC Reinsurance (USA) Inc., United Guaranty Residential Insurance Co., PMI Mortgage Insurance Co., Genworth Mortgage Insurance Corp., Republic Mortgage Insurance Co., Mortgage Guaranty Insurance Corp. and Radian Guaranty Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00375
Filed: March 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Calaveras
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER to DISMISS Certain Defendants, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/4/2012. CASE CLOSED. Based on the plaintiff's 130 notice of voluntary dismissal, this Court DISMISSES this action without prejudice as to defendants HSBC USA, Inc., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Mortgage Corp., HSBC Reinsurance (USA) Inc., and United Guaranty Residential Insurance Co. (Marrujo, C)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER on Motions to Dismiss 94 , 106 , 111 , 117 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/9/12: This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendants Mortgage Guaranty Insurance Corp., Republic Mortgage Insurance Co., Radia n Guaranty, Inc., and Genworth Mortgage Insurance Corp.; Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Defendants Mortgage Guaranty Insurance Corp., Republic Mortgage Insurance Co., Radian Guaranty, Inc., and Genworth Mortgage Insurance Corp. and against Plaintiff Lucas E. McCarn; Plaintiff's further amended complaint due within 20 days of electronic service of this order.(Hellings, J)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 JOINT STIPULATION GRANTED signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 1, 2012. (Munoz, I)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON F.R.Civ.P. 12 Motions signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 5, 2012. Motions Hearing currently set for 9/20/2012 and 10/9/2012 are VACATED. (Munoz, I)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION and ORDER to EXTEND time to respond to complaint. The HSBC Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the FAC is extended to and including October 5, 2012. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/16/2012. (Timken, A)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Lifting Partial Stay, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/9/2012. It is hereby ORDERED that the partial stay imposed on April 12, 2012 is lifted.(Fahrney, E)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER to Dismiss Defendnat, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/7/12: This Court DISMISSES Defendant PMI Mortgage Insurance Company only.(Hellings, J)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING Mortgage Guaranty Insurance Corp., PMI Mortgage Insurance Co., Radian Guaranty Inc., and Republic Mortgage Insurance Co.'s 54 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/25/2012. Amended Complaint Due within 30 Days. (Sant Agata, S)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING a Partial Stay of the Litigation (Docs 42 , 47 , 55 , & 60 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/12/2012. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarn v. HSBC USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas E. McCarn
Represented By: Donna Siegel Moffa, PHV
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna, PHV
Represented By: Edward W. Ciolko, PHV
Represented By: Ramzi Abadou
Represented By: Amanda R. Trask, PHV
Represented By: Terence S. Ziegler, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC USA, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth Ponek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Reinsurance (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Guaranty Residential Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMI Mortgage Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genworth Mortgage Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Mortgage Insurance Co.
Represented By: Richard G. Carlston
Represented By: Matthew C. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Guaranty Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Eileen R. Ridley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radian Guaranty Inc.
Represented By: Stephen A. Fogdall, PHV
Represented By: Christopher H Hart
Represented By: Theresa E. Loscalzo, PHV
Represented By: David Smith, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?