Wilhelm v. Woodford
Plaintiff: Steve Wilhelm
Defendant: Jeannie Woodford
Case Number: 1:2012cv00386
Filed: March 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION, Dismissing Action Without Leave To Amend For Failure To State A Cognizable Claim, And Entering Judgment (ECF No. 30 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/14/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 40 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/03/2014. (Flores, E)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/4/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint be Dismissed without Leave to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/15/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 2/18/2014. (Flores, E)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING 23 Findings and Recommendations Issued November 5, 2013, GRANTING Plaintiff's 24 Motion to File Late Second Amended Complaint, and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to File 25 Second Amended Complaint Lodged November 6, 2013, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/19/13. (Marrujo, C)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/4/2013, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Within Fifteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/26/2013. (Flores, E)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Motion To Extend Time (Docket # 10 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 1/7/2013. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilhelm v. Woodford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie Woodford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?