March 6, 2015 |
Filing
205
Application for Order of Dismissal of Claims of Reginald Gilliam and Juan Valenzuela; ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/6/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
|
November 4, 2014 |
Filing
199
ORDER REQUIRING Filing of Suggestions of Death as to Reginald Gilliam and Juan Valenzuela; and Service of Same Upon Next-of-Kin of Juan Valenzuela, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/4/14. (Hellings, J)
|
October 20, 2014 |
Filing
197
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice; ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/17/14. (Verduzco, M)
|
October 17, 2014 |
Filing
193
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment 192 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/16/14. (Verduzco, M)
|
September 30, 2014 |
Filing
191
STIPULATION and ORDER re DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the dispositive motion filing deadline is extended to 10/31/2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/29/2014. (Timken, A)
|
May 16, 2014 |
Filing
172
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE CROSS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT/SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (DOCS. 107 & 111) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 16, 2014. (Munoz, I)
|
February 21, 2014 |
Filing
160
ORDER to VACATE Summary Judgment Hearing Set By Plaintiff Contrary to Order 111 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/21/14: This Court VACATES the March 26, 2014 hearing. (Hellings, J)
|
February 20, 2014 |
Filing
106
STIPULATION and ORDER re Depositions. The depositions of plaintiffs medical experts will be taken on the following date: March 20, 2014, 9:00 a.m. Deposition of Sarah Morgan, M.D.; March 20, 2014, 1:00 p.m. Deposition of Raquel Espinosa, LCSW . The deposition of plaintiff Douglas Hicks will be taken on the following date: March 21, 2014, 9:00 a.m. With respect to the depositions of Sarah Morgan, M.D. and Raquel Espinosa, LCSW, should scheduling conflicts arise, counsel will cooperate in choosing mutually agreeable new date(s) and time(s) for the depositions. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/20/2014. (Timken, A)
|
January 23, 2014 |
Filing
98
ORDER TO SET SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILING AND BRIEFING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 23, 2014. (Munoz, I)
|
December 23, 2013 |
Filing
97
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS; ORDER THEREON signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 23, 2013. (Munoz, I)
|
October 15, 2013 |
Filing
96
STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/15/2013. (Flores, E)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing
86
ORDER GRANTING Withdrawal of Attorneys with Central California Legal Services, Inc., for Plaintiff Sandra Gray, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/19/2013. (Kusamura, W)
|
May 14, 2013 |
Filing
81
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 69 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 14, 2013. (Munoz, I)
|
April 16, 2013 |
Filing
75
STIPULATION and ORDER of DISMISSAL Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/15/13: The Clerk is DIRECTED to close only Case Nos. 12cv430 and 12cv431. (Hellings, J)
|
March 7, 2013 |
Filing
60
ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/2/2013, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto; Telephonic appearances for the scheduling conference are APPROVED and ENCOURAGED; A joint status report shall be filed by the parties no later than March 26, 2013, that proposes deadlines for discovery and remaining motions; In the caption of the joint status report, the parties shall indicate whether they will be appearing telephonically; and Those parties appearing telephonically are to coordinate one joint call to the Court at the date and time set for the conference. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/7/2013. (Timken, A)
|
March 5, 2013 |
Filing
51
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 5, 2013. (Munoz, I)
|
December 26, 2012 |
Filing
46
MEMORANDUM, DECISION and ORDER; 38 45 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/26/2012. (Kusamura, W)
|
October 1, 2012 |
Filing
36
ORDER to VACATE Hearing set on 10/16/2012, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/29/2012. (Kusamura, W)
|
August 3, 2012 |
Filing
26
STIPULATION and ORDER re DEADLINES signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/2/2012. (Timken, A)
|
July 2, 2012 |
Filing
21
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Plaintiffs shall seek to join any additional plaintiffs to these coordinated proceedings no later than July 16, 2012; All parties shall participate in a meet and confer session on or before July 25, 2012, to discuss whether, in light of additional plaintiffs sought to be joined, the claims of the plaintiffs are amenable to class-action treatment; No later than July 26, 2012, the parties shall file a brief status update regarding the results of their meet and con fer discussions; A status conference to discuss the procedural posture of the cases is set for July 27, 2012, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7; Any parties wishing to appear telephonically at the July 27, 2012, status conference shall inform the Courtroo m Deputy, Alice Timken, no later than July 26, 2012, at (559) 499-5790, and those parties shall coordinate one conference call to the Court at the time of the status conference; Unless ordered otherwise as a result of the July 27, 2012, conference, a ll responses to the complaints shall be filed no later than August 15, 2012; and in anticipation of additional cases being joined to these coordinated proceedings, all other dates that were set at the June 20, 2012, status conference are VACATED and shall be reset at a later date. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/29/2012. (Timken, A)
|
June 5, 2012 |
Filing
12
ORDER Setting Conference to Coordinate Pretrial Proceedings: Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/5/2012. (Kusamura, W)
|
May 30, 2012 |
Filing
11
ORDER to ADDRESS Future Proceedings signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/30/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
|
May 21, 2012 |
Filing
8
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Cases Should Not Be Consolidated and Assigned to Same District and Magistrate Judges re 7 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/21/12. Show Cause Response due by 5/29/2012. (Gonzalez, R)
|
March 27, 2012 |
Filing
4
ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDERED Clerk of the Court to Issue Summons and New Civil Case Documents, including USM-285 Forms; ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons and this order upon the Defendants as DIRECTED by Plaintiff in th USM-285 Form, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/27/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
|